Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1444 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/10/2022

                      	SB 1444 
Initials AG 	Page 1 	Health & Human Services 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DPA/SE 5-2-1-0 | 3
rd
 Read 25-3-2-0 
 
SB 1444: state hospital; administration; oversight 
Sponsor: Senator Fann, LD 1 
Committee on Health & Human Services 
Overview 
Prohibits the Arizona State Hospital (ASH) administration and its employees from retaliating 
against a patient due to the patient or their families participation in the Independent Oversight 
Committee at ASH (ASH-IOC). Requires, by January 1, 2023, the ASH administration to develop 
and implement an innovative clinical improvement and human resources development plan. 
Expands membership and duties of the Joint Legislative Psychiatric Hospital Review Council 
(Council).  
History 
ASH, a division of the Arizona Department of Health Services, is a 260-bed facility that provides 
long-term inpatient psychiatric treatment to individuals with mental illnesses, personality disorders 
or emotional conditions who are under a court order to receive treatment. ASH is divided into 3 
separate facilities: The Civil Hospital, the Forensic Hospital and the Arizona Community 
Protection Center (ACPTC).  
Patients receiving treatment at the Civil hospital have been court-ordered to receive involuntary 
treatment as a result of having been determined to be a danger to themselves or others, gravely 
disabled or persistently and acutely disabled. Patients receiving treatment at the Forensic Hospital 
are court-ordered for either pre-trial or post-trial treatment as a result of involvement with the 
criminal justice system due to a mental health issue. ACPTC supervises and treats persons 
classified as sexually violent persons (A.R.S. Title 36, Chapter 2, Article 1).  
ASH-IOC oversees patients who have been determined to have a serious mental illness and who 
are hospitalized and receiving behavioral health services at the ASH Civil and Forensic hospitals. 
ASH must provide to the ASH-IOC, subject to state and federal law, information regarding: 1) 
Seclusion and use of restraints on patients; 2) Incident accident reports; 3) Allegations of illegal, 
dangerous or inhumane treatment of patients; 4) Provisions of services to patients in need of 
special assistance; 5) Allegations of neglect and abuse; and 6) Allegations of denial of rights 
afforded to patients with serious mental illness, except where a right may be restricted for the 
patient's safety, ASH or the public (A.R.S. § 41-3803). 
Laws 2021, Chapter 402, Sec. 3 created the 10-member Joint Legislative Psychiatric Hospital 
Review Council (Council) to review, analyze and make recommendations regarding: 1) 
Psychiatric hospital capacity in Arizona, including ASH's bed capacity and other public facilities; 
2) The role of private facilities in addressing psychiatric treatment needs; 3) Innovative programs 
to ensure public safety while providing clinically appropriate treatment in the most integrated 
setting; 4) Legal barriers; 5) Current waiting lists; 6) Barriers to accessing appropriate inpatient 
care; 7) Licensing barriers; and 8) Any other issues related to inpatient psychiatric treatment. The 
Council must submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and Legislature 
by December 31, 2021 and 2022.     	SB 1444 
Initials AG 	Page 2 	Health & Human Services 
Provisions 
Arizona State Hospital Independent Oversight Committee  
1. Forbids the ASH administration and its employees from retaliating against a patient because 
the patient or their family participates in the ASH-IOC meetings. (Sec. 1) 
2. Specifies that the aforementioned retaliation prohibition does not preclude the ASH 
administration from acting against a patient who violates hospital policies or procedures.   
(Sec. 1) 
3. Directs the ASH Superintendent and Chief Medical Officer or their designees to: 
a) Attend and participate in scheduled ASH-IOC meetings, except for the public comment 
period; and 
b) Give a report to and respond to questions from the ASH-IOC members. (Sec. 1) 
4. Requires the ASH Superintendent to ensure that the ASH administration: 
a) Fully cooperates with the ASH-IOC in all aspects of its work; 
b) Facilitates ASH-IOC activities related to ASH, pursuant to ADOA rules; and 
c) Timely responds to the ASH-IOC with responsive information to each inquiry or respond 
in writing as to why the request was denied. (Sec. 1) 
Joint Legislative Psychiatric Hospital Review Council  
5. Include in the Council's charge the ability to review, analyze and make recommendations 
regarding the feasibility of transferring ASH to the Arizona Health Care Cost Containment 
System or an alternative oversight entity. (Sec. 2) 
6. Expands the Council's membership to include: 
a) The Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry or their 
designee; 
b) A law enforcement officer appointed by the President of the Senate; and 
c) A person with experience as a chief executive officer or chief operating officer of a hospital, 
appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives. (Sec. 2) 
7. Extends the reporting requirements of the Council to December 31, 2022, and December 31, 
2023. (Sec. 2) 
8. Extends the Council's repeal date from August 31, 2023 to August 31, 2026. (Sec. 2) 
ASH Clinical Improvement and Human Resources Development Plan  
9. Requires, by January 1, 2023, the ASH administration to develop and provide an evidence-
based and innovative clinical improvement and human resources development plan (Plan) 
and the Plan's proposed budget to the following: 
a) Governor; 
b) President of the Senate; 
c) Speaker of the House of Representatives; and 
d) Chairpersons of the Senate and House Health and Human Services Committees.          
(Sec. 3)  
10. Specifies that the Plan and proposed budget be fully implemented by January 1, 2024 and 
developed in collaboration with the ASH-IOC, the Independent Oversight Committee on 
Mental Health, public and private community resources, community providers and guardians, 
families and representatives of patients at ASH. (Sec. 3) 
 
 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	SB 1444 
Initials AG 	Page 3 	Health & Human Services 
11. Requires the Plan to: 
a) Identify necessary enhancements to the services, facilities and staff at ASH to provide 
statutorily required treatment and services to patients in ASH facilities;  
b) Provide options and recommendations to reduce the number of patients statewide seeking 
admission to ASH and reduce the waiting time to be admitted to ASH; 
c) Identify optimal levels of acuity-based staffing at ASH with full-time employees and 
minimal use of contract staff and ways to increase numbers of forensically trained clinical 
staff at both the management and staff levels; 
d) Include a pandemic response and preparedness plan; 
e) Collaborate with community-based treatment facilities to identify levels of service that 
assist in transitioning ASH patients into clinically appropriate settings and ways to increase 
the number of patients who successfully transition into the community with no readmission 
to ASH or other inpatient psychiatric facility; and 
f) Identify an independent third-party residing outside of ASH to investigate incident reports 
and to whom patients, families and advocates may file complaints. (Sec. 3) 
12. Specifies that the pandemic response and preparedness plan must: 
a) Create a set of clinical metrics to significantly mitigate the effects of the COVID-19 
pandemic and staffing shortages on ASH's implementation of each patient's individual 
treatment and discharge plan; and 
b) Ensure continuous operation of ASH with minimal or no cessation or disruption of 
treatment services in the event of a new or recurrent epidemic or pandemic event.        
(Sec. 3) 
13. Repeals requirements relating to the Plan on January 1, 2025. (Sec. 3) 
14. Makes technical and conforming changes. (Sec. 1, 2)