Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1728 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/20/2022

                    Assigned to APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1728 
 
environment; 2022-2023. 
Purpose 
Makes statutory and session law changes relating to the environment necessary to 
implement the FY 2023 state budget. 
Background 
The Arizona Constitution prohibits substantive law from being included in the general 
appropriations, capital outlay appropriations and supplemental appropriations bills. However, it is 
often necessary to make statutory and session law changes to effectuate the budget. Thus, separate 
bills called budget reconciliation bills (BRBs) are introduced to enact these provisions. Because 
BRBs contain substantive law changes, the Arizona Constitution provides that they become 
effective on the general effective date, unless an emergency clause is enacted. 
            S.B. 1728 contains the budget reconciliation provisions for changes relating to the 
environment. 
Provisions 
Water Infrastructure and Commerce Grant Fund (Grant Fund) 
1. Establishes the Grant Fund, administered by the Chief Executive Officer of the Arizona 
Commerce Authority (ACA), consisting of: 
a) legislative appropriations; 
b) federal monies; and 
c) private donations. 
2. Allows Grant Fund monies to be used to provide grants to eligible entities to contract for the 
design and construction of water infrastructure at the eligible entity's location. 
3. Requires the ACA to retain up to one percent of monies in the Grant Fund annually for 
administration. 
4. Deems, as eligible to apply for and receive grant monies: 
a) a public service corporation that: 
i. provides water service pursuant to a certificate of convenience and necessity issued by 
the Arizona Corporation Commission; and 
ii. is acting on behalf of an employer that is an eligible entity; and 
b) an employer with more than 250 employees located in a county with a population between 
400,000 persons and 1,000,000 persons.   FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1728 
Page 2 
 
 
5. Requires the ACA to: 
a) prescribe a simplified form and procedure to apply for and approve grants;  
b) establish requirements and criteria by which grants will be awarded, providing for: 
i. grants to eligible applicants only for new water infrastructure projects located at the 
eligible applicant's property in a county with a population between 400,000 persons 
and 1,000,000 persons; 
ii. grants for projects that create new jobs; 
iii. grants for projects beginning after January 1, 2022; 
iv. grants allocated and distributed by December 31, 2024; 
v. more favorable consideration of applicants who include collaboration and cooperation 
with other community members and entities; and 
vi. applicant requirements; and 
c) before awarding the grant, prepare a written statement signed by the Chief Executive 
Officer of the ACA that: 
i. assesses the direct economic impact of a grant, including the number of new jobs that 
will be created; and 
ii. contains a finding that the award of grant monies is in the best interest of the state. 
6. Outlines applicant requirements, including: 
a) certification that the applicant is eligible to receive grant monies; 
b) a description of the project and services requested and why the project and services are 
needed; and 
c) certification that all grant monies will be used in compliance with Grant Fund 
requirements. 
7. Requires the ACA, by December 15 of each year, to submit a report to the Joint Legislative 
Budget Committee that includes, at a minimum, by project: 
a) the amount of actual expenditures from the Grant Fund; and  
b) an expenditure plan for all remaining monies by project 
8. Specifies that monies in the Grant Fund are continuously appropriated and exempt from 
lapsing. 
Arizona Department of Environmental Quality (ADEQ) 
9. Requires, by December 31, 2024, the Director of ADEQ to: 
a) establish, by rule, permit fees sufficient to administer a Direct Potable Reuse of Treated 
Wastewater Program (Wastewater Program); and 
b) adopt all rules necessary to establish and implement a Wastewater Program, including rules 
establishing permitting standards and a permit application process. 
10. Requires monies collected from Wastewater Program permit fees to be deposited in the Water 
Quality Fee Fund.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1728 
Page 3 
 
 
11. Continues to allow ADEQ, notwithstanding any other law, to use up to $6,531,000 from the 
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund in FY 2023 for: 
a) ADEQ administrative costs; and 
b) remediating sewage discharge issues in Naco, Arizona and other border areas of Arizona. 
12. Continues the cap of $15,000,000 on the appropriation from the state General Fund to the 
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund (WQARF) in FY 2023, notwithstanding statutes 
governing the WQARF. 
13. Continues to require the Director of ADEQ, notwithstanding any other law, to charge fees in 
FY 2023 that are not more than the fees charged in FY 2022 for tests conducted in Area A, as 
defined by statutes governing Annual Emissions Inspection of Motor Vehicles. 
14. Exempts, until July 1, 2023, ADEQ from the rulemaking requirements of the Administrative 
Procedures Act to establish fees for the emissions tests. 
Arizona Department of Agriculture (AZDA) 
15. Continues to allow the Director of the AZDA, notwithstanding any other law and with the 
assistance of the AZDA Council, to continue, increase or lower existing fees from FYs 2021 
and 2022 in FY 2023 for services provided in FY 2023. 
16. Continues to declare that the Legislature intends for additional revenue generated by AZDA 
fee changes in FY 2023 to not exceed: 
a) $218,000 to the state General Fund; 
b) $113,000 to the Pesticide Trust Fund; and 
c) $26,000 to the Dangerous Plants, Pests and Diseases Trust Fund. 
17. Exempts, until July 1, 2023, the AZDA from the rulemaking requirements of the 
Administrative Procedures Act to establish the fees. 
Arizona Department of Water Resources (ADWR) 
18. Continues to allow the Arizona Water Protection Fund (Protection Fund) Commission, 
notwithstanding statutes governing the administration of the Protection Fund, to grant ADWR 
up to $336,000 of the unobligated balance in the Protection Fund to pay for ADWR 
administrative costs in FY 2023. 
Arizona Water Banking Fund 
19. Continues to allow monies appropriated to the Arizona Navigable Stream Adjudication 
Commission from the Arizona Water Banking Fund to be used in FY 2023 to pay legal fees, 
in addition to being used for statutorily provided purposes. 
  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1728 
Page 4 
 
 
Miscellaneous 
20. Makes conforming changes. 
21. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
June 20, 2022 
RC/sr