Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2011 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 04/14/2023

                    House Engrossed   state board of accountancy; continuation           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           CHAPTER 50       HOUSE BILL 2011          An Act   repealing section 41-3023.02, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.02; relating to the Arizona state board of accountancy.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

House Engrossed   state board of accountancy; continuation
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
CHAPTER 50
HOUSE BILL 2011

House Engrossed

 

state board of accountancy; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

CHAPTER 50

 

HOUSE BILL 2011

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3023.02, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.02; relating to the Arizona state board of accountancy.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.02, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.02, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.02. Arizona state board of accountancy; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona state board of accountancy terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 32, chapter 6 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state board of accountancy to ensure that the public is protected from the incompetent practice of accountancy. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3023.02, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.02, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3031.02. Arizona state board of accountancy; termination July 1, 2031

A. The Arizona state board of accountancy terminates on July 1, 2031.

B. Title 32, chapter 6 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state board of accountancy to ensure that the public is protected from the incompetent practice of accountancy.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 13, 2023.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 13, 2023. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 13, 2023.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 13, 2023.