Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2011 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/06/2023

                    Assigned to COM 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2011 
 
state board of accountancy; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Board of Accountancy (Board) for eight years. 
Background 
The Board protects the public from unlawful, incompetent, unqualified or unprofessional 
certified public accountants (CPAs) through certification, regulation and rehabilitation. The Board 
also investigates complaints, establishes reporting requirements and adopts procedures for 
disciplinary actions (A.R.S. § 32-703). A CPA is any individual who has been issued a certificate 
of authority by the Board to practice as a CPA or who meets the limited reciprocity privilege 
requirements (A.R.S. § 32-701). 
The seven-member Board consists of: 1) five members who currently hold valid 
certificates, at least three of whom are in active public practice as CPAs and no more than one of 
these members may be from the same firm; and 2) two public members who do not have a 
certificate but have professional or practical experience in using accounting services and financial 
statements. If a member's certificate is on probation, revoked or suspended, the member's 
appointment automatically terminates and the position becomes vacant (A.R.S. § 32-702).   
The Senate Commerce and House Commerce Joint Committee of Reference (COR) met 
on January 10, 2023, to conduct a review of the Board. The COR recommended the Board be 
continued for eight years (COR Report). The Board is set to terminate on July 1, 2023, unless 
legislation is enacted for its continuation (A.R.S. § 41-3023.02). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Board until July 1, 2031. 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
House Action 
COM 1/17/23            DP     10-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read  2/21/23  50-10-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 6, 2023 
JT/PM/sr