Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2310 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/31/2023

                      	HB 2310 
Initials NM 	Page 1 	Caucus & COW  
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
First Regular Session 
House: MAPS DP 8-6-1-0 
 
HB 2310: auditor general; law enforcement bonus 
Sponsor: Representative Jones, LD 17 
Caucus & COW 
Overview 
Requires the Auditor General to perform a special audit of the counties to ensure that the 
$48,310,000 distributed in FY 2023 to the counties, for the payment of line-level officers employed 
by the sheriffs' offices, are being used properly. 
History 
In 2022, the Fifty-fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session, passed Laws 2022, Chapter 313 
(general appropriations act; 2022-2023) (Appropriations Act). The Appropriations Act, among 
other things, appropriates $48,310,000 to the counties for the purposes of a $10,000 onetime 
payment to line-level deputies and detention officers employed by each county sheriff's office as 
of May 1, 2022. The payments are to be distributed in equal quarterly installments over two years.  
The Appropriations Act additionally requires each county sheriff to submit two reports to the 
Arizona Department of Administration (ADOA) on the actual use of the monies received and on 
staffing and retention. The first report is due on or before August 30, 2023 and the second on or 
before August 30, 2024. ADOA is thereafter directed to submit two reports, the first on or before 
September 30, 2023 and the second on or before September 30, 2024, to the Joint Legislative 
Budget Committee and the Governor's Office of Strategic Planning and Budgeting summarizing 
the individual county reports.  
Provisions 
1. Instructs the Auditor General to perform a special audit of each county to examine and ensure 
that the monies distributed under the Appropriations Act, for payments to line-level deputies 
and detention officers employed by the county sheriffs' offices, are being used properly. (Sec. 
1)  
2. Directs the Auditor General to submit a report of the special audit on or before December 31, 
2023. (Sec. 1) 
3. Repeals statute relating to the special audit and report on October 1, 2024. (Sec. 1) 
 
 
 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note