Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2310 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/06/2023

                    Assigned to MAPS & APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2310 
 
auditor general; law enforcement bonus 
Purpose 
Requires the Office of the Auditor General (OAG) to perform a special audit of each county 
to ensure that the appropriation made for line-level deputy and detention officer retention bonuses 
is being used properly. Appropriates $70,000 from the state General Fund (state GF) in FY 2024 
to the OAG to perform the audit. 
Background 
The FY 2023 General Appropriations Act appropriated $48,310,000 to counties for the 
purposes of onetime $10,000 payments to line-level deputies and detention officers employed by 
each county sheriff's office as of May 1, 2022. Counties are required to distribute payments to 
eligible employees in equal quarterly installments over two years. Counties were also appropriated 
$5,095,000 for the purposes of $5,000 onetime payments to line-level deputies and detention 
officers hired between May 1, 2022, and May 1, 2023. On June 1, 2023, the Arizona Department 
of Administration (ADOA) must distribute the funding to the counties based on the total number 
of hires during this time period as demonstrated by each county. If the amount is insufficient for a 
$5,000 per employee payment, ADOA must distribute a prorated amount based on the total number 
of hired detention officers and sheriff's deputies (Laws 2022, Chapter 313). 
H.B. 2310 appropriates $70,000 from the State GF in FY 2024 to the OAG. 
Provisions 
1. Requires the OAG to perform a special audit of each county to ensure that the $48,310,000 
appropriation made for line-level deputy and detention officer retention bonuses is being used 
properly. 
2. Appropriates $70,000 from the state GF in FY 2024 to the OAG to perform the audit. 
3. Requires the OAG to submit a report of the special audit to the Governor, President of the 
Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives by December 31, 2023, and provide a 
copy to the Secretary of State. 
4. Repeals this legislation on October 1, 2024. 
5. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
House Action 
MAPS 1/30/23 DP 8-6-1-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/21/23  40-20-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 3, 2023 
ZD/sr