Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2432 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/01/2023

                    Assigned to RULES 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2432 
 
technical correction; payment method 
(NOW: supplemental appropriations; AHCCCS; adjustments) 
Purpose 
Appropriates $58,487,600 from the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Fund and 
$3,307,915,900 from expenditure authority in FY 2023 to the Arizona Health Care Cost 
Containment System (AHCCCS) for adjustments in formula requirements. 
Background 
The federal Families First Coronavirus Response Act authorized a temporary increase in 
federal funding to states through a higher than typical federal medical assistance percentage 
(FMAP), also known as the Medicaid matching rate. The increased FMAP percentage became 
available to states on January 1, 2020, and remained at 6.2 percent above each state's regular FMAP 
through March 31, 2023. After this date, the percent will be phased down in each subsequent fiscal 
quarter and end entirely on January 1, 2024 (CRS). 
The Arizona CHIP was established in 1998 and is commonly referred to as KidsCare (Laws 
1998, 4SS, Ch. 4). KidsCare is funded by the federal CHIP Block Grant as well as any state monies 
appropriated to KidsCare. KidsCare provides health care coverage for children up to 19 years old 
who have a family income at or below 200 percent of the Federal Poverty Level and who are not 
eligible for any other AHCCCS coverage (A.R.S. ยง 36-2981).  
Laws 2023, Chapter 17 appropriated $29,243,800 from the CHIP Fund and $1,653,957,950 
from expenditure authority in FY 2023 to AHCCCS for adjustments in formula requirements. 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Appropriates $58,487,600 from the CHIP Fund and $3,307,915,900 from expenditure 
authority in FY 2023 to AHCCCS for adjustments in formula requirements. 
2. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
House Action 
APPROP 2/15/23 DPA/SE 15-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/22/23  43-17-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
April 26, 2023 
MM/slp