Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2439 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/14/2023

                    Assigned to NREW 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2439 
 
vehicle emissions inspections; enactment date 
Purpose 
An emergency measure that extends the date, from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2027, by which 
the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must approve the proposed modifications to the 
vehicle emissions testing program protocols (protocols). 
Background 
Arizona has two areas that are designated by the EPA as serious non-attainment areas 
(EPA). Area A is the greater Phoenix area and Area B is the greater Tucson area (ADEQ).  
Non-attainment areas must complete emissions tests on vehicles to ensure they meet health-based 
standards (ADEQ). The federal Clean Air Act outlines the requirements of states to have State 
Implementation Plans for Air Quality (SIPs) to fulfill the requirements of non-attainment areas 
including, requiring emissions testing (EPA). The EPA must approve any changes to the SIP 
including emissions testing in non-attainment areas (42 U.S.C. ยง 7511).  
In 2021, the Legislature amended the requirements in the SIP for vehicles in Area A and 
Area B within Arizona. The amended requirements change which vehicles receive which 
emissions tests in either Area A or Area B and provides requirements solely for diesel powered 
vehicles (Laws 2021, Ch. 27).  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Extends the date, from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2027, by which the EPA must approve the 
proposed modifications to the protocols as part of the SIP.  
2. Extends the date, from September 1, 2023, to September 1, 2027, by which the Director of the 
ADEQ must notify the Director of the Arizona Legislative Council if the condition was met. 
3. Makes technical changes.  
4. Becomes effective on signature of the Governor, if the emergency clause is enacted.   
House Action 
NREW 2/7/23 DP 10-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/21/23  59-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 13, 2023 
RA/SF/slp