Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2456 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/04/2023

                    Senate Engrossed House Bill   ASDB; continuation           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           CHAPTER 110       HOUSE BILL 2456            An Act   repealing section 41-3023.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3027.06; relating to the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed House Bill   ASDB; continuation
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
CHAPTER 110
HOUSE BILL 2456

Senate Engrossed House Bill

 

ASDB; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

CHAPTER 110

 

HOUSE BILL 2456

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3023.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3027.06; relating to the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3027.06, to read: START_STATUTE41-3027.06. Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind; termination July 1, 2027 A. The board of directors of the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind terminates on July 1, 2027. B. Title 15, chapter 11 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2028. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of directors of the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind to promote and maintain educational opportunities of adequate scope and quality for sensory-impaired children in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3023.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3027.06, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3027.06. Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind; termination July 1, 2027

A. The board of directors of the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind terminates on July 1, 2027.

B. Title 15, chapter 11 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2028. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of directors of the Arizona state schools for the deaf and the blind to promote and maintain educational opportunities of adequate scope and quality for sensory-impaired children in this state.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MAY 1, 2023.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MAY 1, 2023.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.