Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2456 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/31/2023

                    Assigned to GOV 	AS PASSED BY COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2456 
 
ASDB; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Schools for the Deaf and the Blind (ASDB) for two years. 
Background 
The Arizona Constitution requires the Legislature to provide by law for the education and 
care of pupils with visual or hearing impairment (Ariz. Const. art. 11, § 1). Originally established 
in 1912 within the University of Arizona, the Legislature established ASDB as its own agency in 
1929 to provide schools and programs for the education of persons with visual or hearing 
impairment and serve as an optional resource to school districts, state institutions and approved 
educational programs. ASDB is a local education agency responsible for providing a free and 
appropriate public education to students enrolled in its campuses. Subject to statutorily-outlined 
admission procedures, Arizona residents who are 3 years old through 22 years old and are sensory 
impaired to the extent that they cannot acquire appropriate education in their school district of 
residence are entitled to education in the ASDB. ASDB may also enroll children under 3 years old 
who would benefit from a specialized program (Laws 1929, Ch. 93; A.R.S. §§ 15-1302;  
15-1306; and 15-1341 – 15-1344). 
ASDB is governed by a Board of Directors consisting of the Governor as an ex-officio 
member, the Superintendent of Public Instruction and eight Governor-appointed members who 
meet specified criteria (A.R.S. § 15-1321). ASDB operates Phoenix Day School for the Deaf, a 
day program and residential program at the ASDB Tucson campus, an Early Learning Program 
serving children under three years old in homes and satellite preschools and regional cooperative 
programs providing services to students in participating public schools (ASDB). 
The Senate Education Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on Thursday, 
October 27, 2022, and the House Education COR held a public meeting on Tuesday, January 17, 
2023, to review the Auditor General's Performance Audit and Sunset Review Report, evaluate 
ASDB's responses to the sunset review factors and receive public testimony. The CORs 
recommended that the Legislature continue ASDB for eight years, until July 1, 2031 (Senate COR 
Report; House COR Report). The ASDB Board of Directors terminates on July 1, 2023, unless 
continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3023.03). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the ASDB Board of Directors for two years, until 
January 1, 2025.  FACT SHEET – Amended  
H.B. 2456 
Page 2 
 
 
2. Repeals ASDB on January 1, 2026. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
Amendments Adopted by Committee 
• Reduces, from 8 years to 2 years, the continuation of ASDB. 
House Action 	Senate Action 
ED 1/31/23 DP 10-0-0-0  GOV 3/29/23 DPA 8-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/21/23  60-0-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 29, 2023 
LB/slp