Assigned to GOV AS PASSED BY COW ARIZONA STATE SENATE Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session REVISED AMENDED FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2456 ASDB; continuation Purpose Continues the Arizona State Schools for the Deaf and the Blind (ASDB) for four years. Background The Arizona Constitution requires the Legislature to provide by law for the education and care of pupils with visual or hearing impairment (Ariz. Const. art. 11, § 1). Originally established in 1912 within the University of Arizona, the Legislature established ASDB as its own agency in 1929 to provide schools and programs for the education of persons with visual or hearing impairment and serve as an optional resource to school districts, state institutions and approved educational programs. ASDB is a local education agency responsible for providing a free and appropriate public education to students enrolled in its campuses. Subject to statutorily-outlined admission procedures, Arizona residents who are 3 years old through 22 years old and are sensory impaired to the extent that they cannot acquire appropriate education in their school district of residence are entitled to education in the ASDB. ASDB may also enroll children under 3 years old who would benefit from a specialized program (Laws 1929, Ch. 93; A.R.S. §§ 15-1302; 15-1306; and 15-1341 – 15-1344). ASDB is governed by a Board of Directors consisting of the Governor as an ex-officio member, the Superintendent of Public Instruction and eight Governor-appointed members who meet specified criteria (A.R.S. § 15-1321). ASDB operates Phoenix Day School for the Deaf, a day program and residential program at the ASDB Tucson campus, an Early Learning Program serving children under three years old in homes and satellite preschools and regional cooperative programs providing services to students in participating public schools (ASDB). The Senate Education Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on Thursday, October 27, 2022, and the House Education COR held a public meeting on Tuesday, January 17, 2023, to review the Auditor General's Performance Audit and Sunset Review Report, evaluate ASDB's responses to the sunset review factors and receive public testimony. The CORs recommended that the Legislature continue ASDB for eight years, until July 1, 2031 (Senate COR Report; House COR Report). The ASDB Board of Directors terminates on July 1, 2023, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3023.03). There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. FACT SHEET – Amended/Revised H.B. 2456 Page 2 Provisions 1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the ASDB Board of Directors for four years, until July 1, 2027. 2. Repeals ASDB on January 1, 2028. 3. Contains a purpose statement. 4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. Amendments Adopted by Committee • Reduces, from eight years to two years, the continuation of ASDB. Amendments Adopted by Committee of the Whole • Increases, from two years to four years, the continuation of ASDB. Revisions • Corrects the provisions to reflect the accurate continuation period of ASDB. House Action Senate Action ED 1/31/23 DP 10-0-0-0 GOV 3/29/23 DPA 8-0-0 3 rd Read 2/21/23 60-0-0 Prepared by Senate Research May 23, 2023 LB/MH/slp