Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2479 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/19/2023

                      	HB 2479 
Initials NM 	Page 1 	Military Affairs & Public Safety 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
First Regular Session 
 
 
HB 2479: law enforcement merit system; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Payne, LD 27 
Committee on Military Affairs & Public Safety 
Overview 
Continues the Law Enforcement Merit System Council (LEMSC) for 8 years.  
History 
LEMSC is charged with adopting rules to govern the employment of personnel who hold covered 
positions within the Arizona Department of Public Safety (DPS) or the Arizona Peace Officer 
Standards and Training Board (AZPOST). LEMSC rules govern compensation, qualifications, 
selection, retention and other related employment matters for covered employees. LEMSC 
additionally conducts hearings of employee grievances and hears appeals in connection with 
employee suspension, demotion, dismissal, pay reduction and loss of leave time. LEMSC also 
sits to hear disciplinary appeals for other state agencies that employ AZPOST certified full-
authority police officers who hold covered positions (A.R.S. Title 41, Chapter 12, Article 10).  
LEMSC is composed of five members appointed by the Governor, with the consent of the Senate, 
to three-year terms. No more than three of LEMSC's members may be from the same political 
party (A.R.S. § 41-1830.11).  
On November 16, 2022, the House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee of Reference and 
the Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference jointly met to conduct a review of LEMSC and 
recommended that LEMSC be continued for eight years. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, LEMSC until July 1, 2031. (Sec. 2, 4)  
2. Repeals LEMSC on January 1, 2032. (Sec. 2)  
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3)  
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1)  
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note