Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCM2008 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2023

                    Assigned to NREW 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.C.M. 2008 
 
air quality; ozone standards; opposing 
Purpose 
Urges the Biden Administration and the U.S. Congress to stop the U.S. Environmental 
Protection Agency (EPA) from imposing coercive and likely unconstitutional penalties on Arizona 
to comply with an ozone standard that is impossible to attain through any of the control measures 
being considered.  
Background 
In 2015, the EPA revised the primary and secondary National Ambient Air Quality 
Standards (NAAQS) for ground level ozone (80 FR 65292). NAAQS are the ambient air pollutant 
concentration limits established by the EPA pursuant to the federal Clean Air Act (CAA) (A.R.S. 
§ 49-401.01). Primary standards are set by the EPA to protect public health, including protecting 
asthmatics, children and the elderly. Secondary standards are to protect public welfare, including 
decreased visibility, damage to animals, crops or buildings (EPA). Ground level ozone is created 
when volatile organic compounds and nitrogen oxides react in sunlight and can be harmful to 
human health (ADEQ). The new EPA standards lowered ground level ozone from 75 parts per 
million to 70 parts per million (EPA).  
The CAA requires states to submit new recommendations for areas of non-attainment after 
an update to the NAAQS (A.R.S. § 49-405). Arizona submitted new recommendations to the EPA 
on September 27, 2016, and the EPA accepted the recommendations on June 4, 2018 (86 C.F.R.  
§ 58631). On September 16, 2022, the EPA determined the Phoenix-Mesa nonattainment area had 
not attained the new NAAQS by the deadline of August 3, 2021, therefore the EPA designated the 
area as moderate nonattainment (87 C.F.R. § 60898).  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Urges the Biden Administration and the U.S. Congress to stop the U.S. EPA from imposing 
coercive and likely unconstitutional penalties on Arizona to comply with an ozone standard 
that is impossible to attain through any of the control measures being considered.  
2. Directs the Secretary of State to transmit copies of the Memorial to the President of the United 
States, the President of the U.S. Senate, the Speaker of the U.S. House of Representatives and 
each Member of Congress from the State of Arizona.   
  FACT SHEET 
H.C.M. 2008 
Page 2 
 
 
House Action 
NREW 2/14/23 DP 6-3-0-1 
3
rd
 Read 3/1/23  31-28-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 28, 2023 
RA/SF/slp