Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1038 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/24/2023

                    Assigned to JUD 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1038 
 
probate advisory panel; establishment 
Purpose 
Establishes the Probate Advisory Panel (panel) and outlines membership and duties of the 
panel. Requires the panel to hold an annual public hearing on how to improve guardianship and 
conservatorship laws through statutory changes and requires the panel to submit a report of its 
findings on or before November 15 of each year. 
Background 
The purpose of the probate jurisdiction of the courts is: 1) to simplify and clarify the law 
concerning the affairs of decedents, missing persons, protected persons, minors and incapacitated 
persons; 2) to discover and make effective the intent of a decedent in distribution of the decedent's 
property; 3) to promote a speedy and efficient system for liquidating the estate of the decedent and 
making distribution to the decedent's successors; 4) to facilitate use and enforcement of certain 
trusts; and 5) to make uniform the law among the various jurisdictions (A.R.S. § 14-1102).  
A person becomes a guardian of a minor by acceptance of a testamentary appointment or 
upon appointment by the court. The guardianship status continues until terminated, without regard 
to the location from time to time of the guardian and minor ward. A person becomes a guardian of 
an incapacitated person by a parental or spousal appointment or on appointment by the court. The 
guardianship continues until it is terminated, without regard to the location of the guardian or the 
ward (A.R.S. §§ 14-5201 and 14-5301.02). 
The court may appoint a conservator on petition and after notice and a hearing in relation 
to the estate and affairs of a minor if the court determines that a minor owns money or property 
that requires management or protection that cannot otherwise be provided, or the minor has or may 
have affairs that may be jeopardized or prevented by minority or that funds are needed for the 
minor's support and education and that protection is necessary or desirable to obtain or provide 
funds. The court may also appoint a conservator in relation to the estate and affairs of a person if 
the court finds that; 1) the person is unable to manage the person's estates and affairs due to mental 
illness, mental deficiency, mental disorder, physical illness or disability, chronic use of drugs, 
chronic intoxication, confinement, detention by a foreign power or disappearance; and 2) that the 
person has property that will be wasted or dissipated unless proper management is provided, or 
that funds are needed for the support, care and welfare of the person or those entitled to be 
supported by the person and that protection is necessary or desirable to obtain or provide funds. 
(A.R.S. § 14-5401) 
The court must appoint a public fiduciary for those persons or decedents' estates in need of 
guardianship, conservatorship or administration and for whom there is no person or corporation 
qualified and willing to act in that capacity (A.R.S. § 14-5602).  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1038 
Page 2 
 
 
Provisions 
1. Establishes the panel in the Office of the Governor. 
2. Outlines that the panel is comprised of the following members: 
a) two public members who are guardians of an adult child or a sibling who is a ward, one of 
which is to be appointed by the President of the Senate and the other to be appointed by 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives; 
b) two public members who are conservators of a parent who is a protected person, one of 
which is to be appointed by the President of the Senate and the other to be appointed by 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives; 
c) one public fiduciary who is licensed by the Arizona Supreme Court and who is from a 
county with a population of less than 500,000 persons to be appointed by the Governor; 
d) one fiduciary, who is not a public fiduciary, licensed by the Arizona Supreme Court and 
who is from a county with a population of more than 500,000 persons, to be appointed by 
the Governor; 
e) one attorney who has a minimum of four years experience in guardianship and 
conservatorship proceedings, to be appointed by the Governor; 
f) one judicial officer who has a minimum of two years experience presiding over 
guardianship and conservatorship proceedings and who is from a county with a population 
of more than 500,000 persons, to be appointed by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court; 
and 
g) one clerk of the superior court, to be appointed by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court.  
3. Requires the panel to: 
a) select a chairperson at its first annual meeting; 
b) hold a public hearing at least once per year, or at the request of the chairperson, on how to 
improve the guardianship and conservatorship laws through statutory changes;  
c) submit a report of its findings and recommendations on or before November 15 of each 
year to the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President of the 
Senate and the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court; and 
d) provide a copy of each report to the Secretary of State. 
4. Prohibits panel members from receiving compensation or reimbursement of expenses. 
5. Limits the initial terms of the members of the panel to: 
a) three terms ending January 1, 2024; 
b) three terms ending January 1, 2025; and 
c) three terms ending January 1, 2026.  
6. Requires the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the 
Governor, and the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court to make all subsequent appointments as 
prescribed.  
7. Becomes effective on the general effective date.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
January 24, 2023 
ZD/KS/sr