Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1075 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2023

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1075 
 
optometry board; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Board of Optometry (Board) for six years.  
Background 
The Board is the regulatory body that oversees the licensing and practice of optometry in 
Arizona. The Board's duties include: 1) adopting rules to govern the practice of optometry;  
2) adopting criteria for approving continuing education programs for licensees; and 3) reporting 
allegations of criminal wrongdoing to the appropriate criminal justice agency (A.R.S. § 32-1704).  
The Board consists of seven members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) five 
members licensed in the practice of optometry who have been engaged in active practice for the 
three years immediately before appointment; and 2) two public members who do not have a direct 
or indirect interest in the practice of optometry, opticianry or medicine. Before appointment, a 
prospective member of the Board must submit a full set of fingerprints to the Governor to obtain 
state and federal criminal records (A.R.S. § 32-1702).  
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 12, 2023, to review and evaluate the Board's response to the sunset review 
factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the Board be continued for six 
years (COR Report). The Board terminates on July 1, 2023, unless continued by the Legislature 
(A.R.S. § 41-3023.08). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Board until July 1, 2029.  
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2030.  
3. Contains a purpose statement.  
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 23, 2023 
MG/JM/slp