Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1727 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/08/2023

                    Assigned to APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1727 
 
higher education; 2023-2024. 
Purpose 
Makes session law changes relating to higher education necessary to implement the FY 
2024 state budget. 
Background 
The Arizona Constitution prohibits substantive law from being included in the general 
appropriations, capital outlay appropriations and supplemental appropriations bills. However, it is 
often necessary to make statutory and session law changes to effectuate the budget. Thus, separate 
bills called budget reconciliation bills (BRBs) are introduced to enact these provisions. Because 
BRBs contain substantive law changes, the Arizona Constitution provides that they become 
effective on the general effective date, unless an emergency clause is enacted. 
S.B. 1727 contains the budget reconciliation provisions for changes relating to higher 
education. 
Provisions 
Spouses and Dependents of Law Enforcement Officers Tuition Scholarship Fund 
1. Establishes the Spouses and Dependents of Law Enforcement Officers Tuition Scholarship 
Fund (Scholarship Fund), administered by the Arizona Board of Regents (ABOR) and 
consisting of legislative appropriations.  
2. Requires ABOR, in FYs 2024 through 2027 and subject to available monies, to use Scholarship 
Fund monies to award tuition scholarships to the spouse of a law enforcement officer or a 
dependent of a law enforcement officer who is younger than 27 years old who enrolls in: 
a) an Arizona public university; 
b) a community college; 
c) a career and technical education program that is offered to adults or an associate degree 
program offered by a career and technical education district (CTED); or 
d) a licensed Arizona private postsecondary educational institution.  
3. Allows an eligible individual to apply to ABOR for a Scholarship Fund tuition scholarship in 
a manner prescribed by ABOR and requires ABOR to verify that the individual satisfies the 
eligibility requirements before awarding a tuition scholarship. 
4. Requires ABOR to award an eligible individual, on a first-come, first-served basis, a tuition 
scholarship that is equal to the tuition and mandatory fees charged by the university, 
community college or CTED in which the individual is enrolled, reduced by any federal aid 
scholarships, public grants or other financial gifts, grants or aid received by that individual.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1727 
Page 2 
 
 
5. Caps a Scholarship Fund tuition scholarship to an eligible individual enrolled in a private 
postsecondary educational institution at the remainder of the average in-state tuition and fees 
charged by public universities, reduced by any other gifts and aid awarded to that individual.   
6. Prohibits ABOR from awarding a tuition scholarship, if: 
a) there are insufficient Scholarship Fund monies; or 
b) an applicant is not charged to attend a CTED program. 
7. Limits a Scholarship Fund tuition scholarship to not more than four academic years or eight 
semesters and limits tuition scholarship uses to: 
a) a CTED program certificate or license, a private vocational program, an associate degree 
or a baccalaureate degree; and  
b) pay tuition and mandatory fees at a CTED, a qualifying private postsecondary educational 
institution, a public Arizona university or community college. 
8. Allows ABOR to rely on a copy of a law enforcement officer's commission card and a current 
employment verification letter from the law enforcement officer's employer to establish that 
an individual is a law enforcement officer. 
9. Prohibits ABOR from distributing additional Scholarship Fund monies to an individual who 
ABOR determines no longer satisfies eligibility requirements until the individual submits 
documentation showing that the individual satisfies all requirements. 
10. Allows ABOR to adopt rules to administer the Scholarship Fund.  
11. Specifies that Scholarship Fund monies are continuously appropriated and exempt from 
lapsing. 
12. Requires ABOR, by March 1, 2024, and each subsequent year, to report to the Joint Legislative 
Budget Committee and the Governor's Office of Strategic Planning and Budgeting: 
a) the total number of students who received a tuition scholarship, by eligible postsecondary 
institution, in the current academic year;  
b) the total amounts awarded and average amounts awarded, by eligible postsecondary 
institution, in the current academic year; 
c) the total number of students who received a tuition scholarship and graduated or completed 
a program of study, by eligible postsecondary institution; and 
d) each law enforcement agency that employs a law enforcement officer whose spouse or 
dependent, or both, receives a tuition scholarship.  
13. Defines law enforcement officer as an individual who is currently employed as either a peace 
officer, as statutorily defined, or a correctional officer. 
Arizona Area Health Education System 
14. Requires ABOR to distribute monies appropriated for primary care residency programs in FY 
2024 to the Arizona Area Health Education System to establish a program for qualifying 
community health centers, rural health clinics and tribal health facilities that: 
a) supports and expands the number of primary care residency positions;  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1727 
Page 3 
 
 
b) provides support and technical assistance for starting or expanding primary care residency 
programs in rural areas and health professional shortage areas;  
c) facilitates information and resource sharing; and  
d) provides training and technical assistance, including preceptor training and development, 
continuing education, medical library access and other functions, to support the success of 
qualifying community health center, rural health clinic and tribal health facility primary 
care residency programs. 
15. Authorizes the Arizona Area Health Education System to use up to $500,000 of the monies 
distributed for primary care residency programs in FY 2024 to support a collaborative of 
qualifying community health centers', rural health clinics' and tribal health facilities' primary 
care residency programs. 
16. Defines primary care as family medicine, internal medicine, pediatrics, pediatric internal 
medicine, psychiatry, obstetrics and gynecology, geriatrics or general surgery.  
17. Defines tribal health facility as an outpatient health facility that is operated by an Indian tribe 
and that is authorized to provide services according to the federal Indian Self-Determination 
and Education Assistance Act. 
Miscellaneous 
18. Directs, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the State Treasurer in FY 2024 to: 
a) on notice from ABOR, invest and divest monies in the Arizona Veterinary Loan Assistance 
Fund and the Spouses of Military Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund; and 
b) credit monies earned from investment to the respective fund. 
19. Repeals, on January 1, 2025, the requirements on the State Treasurer investing and divesting 
the specified fund monies. 
20. Continues, for FY 2024, to allow the required state match to be less than two dollars for each 
dollar raised by the surcharge on student registration fees pursuant to the Arizona Financial 
Aid Trust Fund. 
21. Specifies that operating state aid for community college districts (CCD) in FY 2024 is as 
prescribed in the FY 2024 General Appropriations Act. 
22. Specifies that state aid for CCD science, technology, engineering and mathematics and 
workforce development programs in FY 2024 is as prescribed in the FY 2024 General 
Appropriations Act. 
23. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
May 8, 2023 
LB/MH/slp