Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2016 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/05/2024

                      	HB 2016 
Initials EB/BSR 	Page 1 Natural Resources, Energy & Water 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
 
 
HB 2016: grandfathered right; subsequent AMA; extension 
Sponsor: Representative Griffin, LD 19 
Committee on Natural Resources, Energy & Water 
Overview 
An emergency measure that extends the deadline for  a person to claim a grandfathered right 
to withdraw or receive and use groundwater in the Douglas active management area 
(Douglas AMA). An application for a certificate of grandfathered right must be filed with the 
Arizona Department of Water Resources (ADWR) no later than 21 months, rather than 15 
months, after the designation date of the Douglas AMA. 
History 
The Groundwater Management Code (Code) was enacted in 1980 which established the 
statutory framework to regulate and control the use of  groundwater (SOS). Currently, the 
Code is administered by ADWR. As part of the management framework, the Code designated 
five AMAs (Phoenix, Pinal, Prescott, Tucson and Santa Cruz) and three Irrigation Non-
Expansion Areas (Douglas, Joseph City and Harquahala) (A.R.S. §§ 45-411, 45-411.03, 45-
431 and 45-554).  
Under current law local landowners can petition their county board of supervisors to 
designate an AMA for one or more groundwater basins. If the petitioners meet a certain 
statutory threshold, an election will be called (A.R.S. § 45-415).  
Based on a petition filed by the residents of Cochise County, the Cochise County Board of 
Supervisors called an election to be held on November 8, 2022 on whether to designate the 
Douglas Groundwater Basin as an AMA. Subsequently, the ballot measure was approved and 
the Douglas AMA was established on December 1, 2022 (ADWR). 
Individuals and entities seeking to use groundwater are required to apply for a certificate of 
grandfathered right no later than 15 months after the date of the designation of the AMA 
with ADWR. Grandfathered rights are withdrawal rights based on historic pumping (the five-
year period preceding the call for the election or the five-year period preceding the 
designation of the AMA (A.R.S. § 45-476)(ADWR).  
The current deadline to apply for a certificate of grandfathered right for the Douglas AMA is 
March 1, 2024. 
Provisions 
1. Extends the deadline, from 15 months to 21 months after the date of the designation of 
the Douglas AMA, for a person to file an application for a certificate of grandfathered 
right with ADWR to withdraw or receive and use groundwater in the Douglas AMA. (Sec 
1) 
2. Repeals these requirements on January 1, 2025. (Sec. 1)    	HB 2016 
Initials EB/BSR 	Page 2 Natural Resources, Energy & Water 
3. Contains an emergency clause. (Sec. 2) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☒ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note