Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2107 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/06/2024

                    Assigned to MAPS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2107 
 
department of homeland security; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Homeland Security (AZDOHS) for four years. 
Background 
The AZDOHS must: 1) formulate policies, plans and programs to enhance the ability of 
Arizona to prevent and respond to acts of terrorism, cybersecurity threats and other critical hazards; 
2) adhere to all federal grant terms and conditions; 3) request appropriations or grants of monies 
for homeland security purposes; 4) receive all awards granted to Arizona by the federal 
government for homeland security purposes; and 5) distribute monies to local jurisdictions and 
other organizations eligible under federal regulations based on criteria in the federal grant 
guidelines (A.R.S. § 41-4254). 
The Senate Government Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 
17, 2024, to review and evaluate AZDOHS's response to sunset review factors and receive public 
testimony. The COR recommended that AZDOHS be continued for two years until July 1, 2026. 
AZDOHS terminates on July 1, 2024, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S § 41- 3024.22). 
Any agency may be continued by the Legislature for a period not to exceed ten years. At the end 
of such period, it must again be subject to sunset review (A.R.S. § 41-2955). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, AZDOHS until July 1, 2028. 
2. Repeals AZDOHS on January 1, 2029.  
3. Contains a purpose statement.  
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
House Action 
MAPS 2/5/24 DPA 13-0-0-1 
3
rd
 Read 2/22/24  57-0-2-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 1, 2024 
ZD/KK/cs