Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2173 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/11/2024

                    Assigned to ED 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2173 
 
county aid; school districts; revisions 
Purpose 
Modifies property tax levy calculations for a common school district not within a high 
school district (Type 03 district). Outlines property tax reductions in TY 2024 for each Type 03 
district that levied the minimum qualifying tax rate (MQTR) in TY 2023. 
Background 
Laws 2022, Chapter 285 eliminates the requirement for a Type 03 district to pay tuition for 
high school pupils who reside in the Type 03 district and attend another school district. Students 
who reside in a Type 03 district and attend another school district for high school are enrolled in 
the school district of the student's attendance for the purposes of: 1) determining student count and 
apportionment of state aid; and 2) providing a free and appropriate education under the federal 
Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (A.R.S. § 15-824).  
A county board of supervisors (BOS) must annually levy, at the time of levying other taxes, 
an additional tax in each Type 03 district equal to the product of: 1) the countywide average per 
pupil equalization base for high school pupils; and 2) the number of the district's resident high 
school pupils during the prior school year. Monies collected by the property tax must be added to 
county aid for equalization assistance and distributed to school districts in the same manner as the 
state equalization tax rate.  
Statute determines that a school district is not eligible for equalization assistance if the 
school district's equalization base exceeds the amount levied by the applicable qualifying tax rate 
(QTR). In each school district not eligible for equalization assistance, a county BOS must annually 
levy an additional tax referred to as the MQTR. The MQTR levy amount is determined based on 
the difference between the levy that would be produced by 50 percent of the school district's 
applicable QTR and its equalization base (A.R.S. § 15-992). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund (state GF) associated with 
this legislation. 
Provisions 
MQTR and Additional Tax in Type 03 Districts 
(Retroactive to Tax Years Beginning on January 1, 2024) 
1. Modifies the MQTR levy amount in a school district not eligible for equalization assistance by 
subtracting the amount levied by the additional tax in Type 03 districts.  FACT SHEET 
H.B. 2173 
Page 2 
 
 
2. Replaces the requirement to levy an additional tax in a Type 03 district equal to the countywide 
average per pupil equalization base for high school pupils multiplied by the number of resident 
high school pupils in the Type 03 district during the prior school year, with a requirement to 
levy an additional tax in a Type 03 district that is equal to the lesser of: 
a) a rate that is equal to the applicable QTR; or 
b) a rate that would result in a levy that equals the countywide average per pupil equalization 
base for high school pupils multiplied by the student count of resident high school pupils 
in the Type 03 district during the prior school year. 
3. Redirects monies collected from the additional tax levied in Type 03 districts from county aid 
for equalization assistance to the State Treasurer for deposit in the state GF to aid in school 
financial assistance. 
4. Requires the ADE to annually provide each county BOS with the countywide average per pupil 
equalization base for high school pupils and the student count, rather than number of, high 
school pupils in the Type 03 district during the prior school year. 
School District Primary Property Tax Cap 
5. Excludes the MQTR and additional tax in Type 03 districts from the criteria that the Property 
Tax Oversight Commission (PTOC) uses to determine whether a school district's primary 
property tax rate exceeds the prescribed maximum permissible primary property tax rate. 
Type 03 District Property Tax Reductions 
6. Requires each county BOS that levied the MQTR in TY 2023 in one or more Type 03 districts 
to: 
a) in TY 2024, reduce the tax levy in each Type 03 district by an amount determined by the 
county BOS and approved by the PTOC; and 
b) direct the county treasurer to distribute any unexpended and unencumbered monies that 
were collected by the MQTR in TY 2023 to each Type 03 district to offset the reductions 
determined by the county BOS and approved by the PTOC. 
7. Repeals the Type 03 district property tax reduction requirements on January 1, 2027. 
Miscellaneous 
8. Allows ADE, in FYs 2025 and 2026, to use the most recent data from ADE's annual open 
enrollment report to provide the information a county BOS requires to levy the additional tax 
in a Type 03 district. 
9. Resolves conflicting statutes retroactive to July 1, 2023. 
10. Makes technical and conforming changes. 
11. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with retroactive provisions as noted. 
   FACT SHEET 
H.B. 2173 
Page 3 
 
 
House Action  
ED  1/30/24 DPA 10-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/22/24 58-0-1-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 11, 2024 
MH/slp