Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2177 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/12/2024

                    Assigned to JUD & APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2177 
 
jury; parental rights; termination 
Purpose 
Effective July 1, 2025, entitles a parent to a jury trial in a hearing to terminate the  
parent-child relationship or parental rights, if a jury trial is requested. Requires the Administrative 
Office of the Courts (AOC) to issue a report on jury trials conducted for these proceedings. 
Background 
After a petition has been filed, the clerk of the superior court must set a time and place for 
the initial hearing to terminate the parent-child relationship. If a petition for terminating the  
parent-child relationship is contested, the court must hold a termination adjudication hearing 
within 90 days after the initial severance hearing. The court's findings with respect to grounds for 
termination must be based on clear and convincing evidence, and the court may consider any and 
all reports required by statute or ordered by the court, and such reports are admissible in evidence 
without objection. This clear and convincing evidence standard also applies to hearings to 
terminate parental rights. If a parent does not appear at a pretrial conference, status conference or 
a termination adjudication hearing, and the court determines that the parent has been properly 
served or instructed to appear, the court may find that the parent has waived the parent's legal 
rights and is deemed to have admitted to the allegations of the petition (A.R.S. §§ 8-535; 8-537 
and 8-863).  
The required size and degree of unanimity of juries depends on the type of case being tried 
before the court. Beginning January 1, 2023, a jury for trial in any court of record of a civil case 
must consist of eight persons, and the concurrence of all but two is necessary to render a verdict 
(A.R.S. § 21-102). 
According to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee (JLBC), assuming that 25 percent of 
hearings to terminate parental rights would be tried by a jury, H.B. 2177 would cost the Attorney 
General (AG) $1.4 million from the state General Fund and would cost the courts $4.2 million 
from their own funds (JLBC Fiscal Note). 
Provisions 
1. Requires a hearing to terminate parental rights to be tried to a jury if a parent files a written 
request for a jury trial before or at the time of the initial termination hearing.  
2. Requires notice of the option for a jury trial to be included in the notice of initial hearing. 
3. Allows one jury trial to be held for termination proceedings if a court receives multiple requests 
for a jury trial.   FACT SHEET 
H.B. 2177 
Page 2 
 
 
4. Requires the number and concurrence of jurors for a trial held for termination proceedings to 
be consistent with the limits established in statute. 
5. Requires a jury trial held for termination proceedings to be commenced not later than 120 days 
after the initial termination hearing is completed. 
6. Requires the AOC, by January 1, 2027, to review: 
a) the number of jury trials requested pursuant to this legislation; 
b) the number of jury trials completed; 
c) the outcome and length of jury trials compared to the outcome and length of bench trials;  
d) feedback from parties, attorneys, judges, juries and court staff in a jury trial case; and 
e) any other relevant data or information related to jury trials and bench trials in termination 
of parental rights proceedings.  
7. Requires the AOC to issue a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the 
President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Secretary of State. 
8. Becomes effective on July 1, 2025. 
House Action 
JUD 2/14/24 DPA 6-2-1-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/22/24  31-28-0-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 11, 2024 
ZD/cs