Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2208 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/22/2024

                    Assigned to FICO 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2208 
 
continuation; ASRS 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Retirement System (ASRS) for eight years. 
Background 
ASRS administers a public pension program for state employees. ASRS: 1) provides an 
incentive in the recruitment and retention of employees; 2) contributes toward providing a 
compensation package as prescribed; 3) provides a retirement system that encourages employees 
to remain in service to provide public employers with the full benefit of the training and experience 
gained by the employees; and 4) provides an orderly method of promoting and maintaining a high 
level of service to the public (A.R.S. § 38-712). 
The Senate Finance and Commerce Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting 
on January 29, 2024, to review and evaluate ASRS's response to the sunset review factors and 
receive public testimony. The COR recommended that ASRS be continued for eight years until 
July 1, 2032. ASRS terminates on July 1, 2024, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S  
§ 41- 3024.26).  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, ASRS until January 1, 2032. 
2. Repeals ASRS on January 1, 2033. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
House Action 
WM  1/17/24  DP  10-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read  1/25/24   56-0-3-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 22, 2024 
MG/JC/cs