Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2760 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/07/2024

                    Assigned to ED 	AS PASSED BY COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2760 
 
Holocaust education study committee 
Purpose 
Establishes the Education on the Holocaust and Other Genocides Study Committee (Study 
Committee). 
Background 
The State Board of Education (SBE) must prescribe a minimum course of study and 
competency requirements for common schools and high schools that incorporate academic 
standards in reading, writing, mathematics, science and social studies. In adopting the course of 
study and competency requirements, the SBE must include a requirement that students be taught 
about the Holocaust and other genocides at least twice between grades 7 and 12 (A.R.S. §§ 15-701 
– 15-701.02). 
The SBE requires students: 1) in grades 7 and 8 to receive instruction on the Holocaust and 
other genocides at least once and; 2) in grades 9 through 12 receive one credit of world history or 
geography that includes instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides (A.A.C. R7-2-301 and 
A.A.C. R7-2-302). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Establishes the Study Committee, consisting of the following members: 
a) three members of the Senate who are appointed by the President of the Senate (President); 
b) three members of the House of Representatives (House) who are appointed by the Speaker 
of the House (Speaker); 
c) the Superintendent of Public Instruction (SPI) or the SPI's designee; 
d) two members of the SBE who are appointed by the President; 
e) one public school teacher who is appointed by the Speaker; 
f) one faculty member from an Arizona public university who is appointed by the Speaker; 
and 
g) three public members who have expertise in the Holocaust and other genocides and are 
appointed by the Governor. 
2. Requires the Study Committee to: 
a) review the course of study and competency requirements that include a requirement that 
students be taught about the Holocaust and other genocides;  FACT SHEET – Amended  
H.B. 2760 
Page 2 
 
 
b) study how teacher lessons and trainings in public schools regarding the Holocaust and other 
genocides can be improved; 
c) study how Arizona public universities can incorporate teachings of the Holocaust and other 
genocides into courses and campus engagements; 
d) explore how public schools and universities can facilitate speaking engagements by 
survivors, survivors' families and liberators for students; and 
e) submit a report, by April 1, 2025, regarding the Study Committee's activities and 
recommendations for legislative action to the Governor, the President and the Speaker and 
provide a copy of the report to the Secretary of State. 
3. Determines that Study Committee members serve at the pleasure of the person who made the 
appointment. 
4. Specifies that not more than two of the members from the Senate or the House may be from 
the same political party. 
5. Specifies that Study Committee members are not eligible to receive compensation and 
appointed Study Committee members are eligible for reimbursement of expenses. 
6. Repeals the Study Committee on October 1, 2025. 
7. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
Amendments Adopted by Committee 
1. Expands the duties and requirements of the Study Committee to include other genocides, in 
addition to the Holocaust. 
2. Delays the Study Committee's report deadline from December 15, 2024, to April 1, 2025. 
House Action  	Senate Action 
ED 2/13/24 DP 10-0-0-0 ED 3/6/24 DPA 7-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/27/24  56-1-2-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 7, 2024 
MH/slp