Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2909 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/20/2024

                      	HB 2909 
Initials VP 	Page 1 	House Engrossed 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
House: APPROP 9-7-1-0-0 
 
HB 2909: taxation; 2024 - 2025 
Sponsor: Representative Livingston, LD 28 
House Engrossed 
Overview 
Contains provisions relating to taxation needed to implement the FY 2025 budget. 
History 
The Arizona Legislature adopts a budget for each fiscal year (FY) that contains general 
appropriations. Article IV, Section 20, Part 2 of the Constitution of Arizona requires the 
General Appropriations Act (feed bill) to contain only appropriations for the different state 
departments, state institutions, public schools and interest on public debt. Statutory changes 
necessary to reconcile the appropriations made in the feed bill and other changes are drafted 
into separate budget bills. These bills are prepared according to subject area. 
Provisions 
Department of Revenue 
1. Changes the implementation date of Laws 2024, Chapter 142 (HB2382), from January 1, 
2026 to January 1, 2028, which required the Department of  Revenue to establish a 
process by which a third-party provider that offers sourcing services to taxpayers for 
transactions involving  tangible personal property to become certified. (Sec. 1) 
2. Extends the transaction privilege and use tax exemption for qualifying equipment 
purchased by businesses certified as healthy forest enterprises from June 30, 2024 to 
December 31, 2026. (Sec. 2, 3) 
3. Caps the aggregate dollar level of the Corporate Low Income Student Tuition Tax Credit 
at $135 million annually, beginning in FY25. (Sec. 4) 
4. Expands the eligibility for scholarships from the "Switcher" Individual Income Tax Credit 
and Corporate Low-Income Student Tuition Tax Credit  programs to include foster care 
children that meet certain requirements and that if a court rules these provisions 
unenforceable these provisions would not become effective. (Sec. 5, 6) 
5. Requires, as session law, county supervisors to reduce property tax levies in FY25 in 
elementary districts without a high school that are non-state districts and that were 
required to levy the minimum qualifying tax rate (MQTR) in FY24 and beginning in 
FY25, Type 03 county levies will be deducted from the MQTR on an ongoing basis 
pursuant to Laws 2024, Chapter 134 (HB2173). (Sec. 7) 
6. Stipulates, as session law, legislative intent that the amount to be charged to all counties, 
cities, towns, Council of Governments and regional transportation authorities with a 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	HB 2909 
Initials VP 	Page 2 	House Engrossed 
population greater than 800,000 for the Integrated Tax System Project shall not exceed 
$6,626,900 for FY25 and provides the mechanism to apportion the amount. (Sec 10) 
7. Stipulates, as session law, legislative intent that the amounts charged to 16% recreational 
marijuana excise tax and the 0.6% education sales tax for the Integrated Tax System 
Project shall not exceed $179,000 and $803,600, respectively in FY25. (Sec. 10) 
Qasimyar v. Maricopa County Tax Litigation 
8. Stipulates, as session law, that taxing jurisdictions, including school districts, that are 
liable for tax refunds in the Qasimyar v. Maricopa County litigation and that estimate 
the judgement would result in a property tax increase of 4% or more may issue tax 
anticipation notes that mature four years following the issuance of the notes or request 
that the state loan commissioners issue bonds to redeem or refund the tax anticipation 
notes and repeals this provision December 31, 2030. (Sec. 8) 
9. Authorizes, as session law, the AZ Department of Education (ADE) to re-calculate basic 
state aid for districts liable for Qasimyar v. Maricopa County tax refunds without the 
adoption of a resolution by a school district governing board and requires ADE to submit 
proposed re-calculations to JLBC for review. (Sec. 9) 
10. Requires, as session law, school districts to reduce their levies to cover property tax 
refunds ordered in the Qasimyar v. Maricopa County litigation to account for estimated 
revenues from basic state aid re-calculations authorized by A.R.S. 15-915.B. Requires 
ADE to estimate the A.R.S. 15-915.B recalculations by district by August 1, 2024 and 
provide its estimate to the Property Tax Oversight Commission, JLBC and OSPB. (Sec. 
9) 
11. Authorizes, as session law, school districts liable for Qasimyar v. Maricopa County tax 
refunds to use any unbudgeted cash balances from FY23 from their Maintenance and 
Operations Fund or Unrestricted Capital Fund that were not included in the school 
district's adopted FY24 budget to cover the cost of the refunds. (Sec. 9) 
12. Clarifies, as session law, that any limitations on school district tax levies for Qasimyar v. 
Maricopa County tax refunds shall not be construed to prevent school districts from 
levying sufficient property taxes to pay required debt service on general obligation bonds. 
(Sec. 9) 
13. Requires, as session law, the Maricopa County Treasurer to include a statement on the 
TY24 property tax bills stating, "Your tax rate includes an increase to cover the cost of 
tax refunds ordered in class action litigation." (Sec. 9) 
14. Contains an emergency clause. (Sec. 11)