Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HJR2001 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/15/2024

                      	HJR 2001 
Initials VP/MG 	Page 1 	Caucus & COW 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
House: WM DPA 10-0-0-0 
 
HJR2001: Phoenix-Mesa gateway airport; reuse zone 
Sponsor: Representative Grantham, LD 14 
Caucus & COW 
Overview 
Designates the Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport as a Military Reuse Zone (MRZ) until October 
19, 2036. 
History 
Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport, formerly Williams Air Force Base, closed on September 30, 
1993. On August 23, 1996, Executive Order 96-12 designated the airport as an MRZ under 
the 1992 enactment of the Arizona Defense Restructuring and Military Reuse Zone 
Programs, and remained an MRZ until July 2006. On October 19, 2006, Executive Order 
2006-15 designated the airport as an MRZ for ten years. Executive Order 2015-11 continued 
the designation until October 19, 2026, when it is set to expire. 
After executing a lease with a term of 15 years or longer for the use or occupancy of real 
property or improvements that are located on a closed military facility with a runway that is 
at least 8,000 feet long at closing or after title to any part of a closed military facility with a 
runway that is at least 8,000 feet long at closing is transferred to Arizona or to another public 
or private entity, the governor, after consulting with the CEO of the Arizona Commerce 
Authority (ACA), may designate the property as a MRZ (A.R.S.  41-1531). 
Provisions 
1. Continues the designation of the Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport as an MRZ. 
2. Extends the date of termination for the MRZ to October 19, 2036. 
3. Requires the Secretary of State to transmit copies of the continuation to the City of 
Phoenix and the City of Mesa. 
Amendments 
Committee on Ways & Means 
1. Modifies the date of termination for the MRZ to October 19, 2031. 
 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note