HJR 2001 Initials VP/MG Page 1 Transmitted ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session House: WM DPA 10-0-0-0 | 3 rd Read 56-0-3-0-1 Senate: FICO DP 4-1-2-0 | 3 rd Read 21-6-3-0-0 HJR2001: Phoenix-Mesa gateway airport; reuse zone Sponsor: Representative Grantham, LD 14 Transmitted Overview Designates the Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport as a Military Reuse Zone (MRZ) until October 19, 2031. History Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport, formerly Williams Air Force Base, closed on September 30, 1993. On August 23, 1996, Executive Order 96-12 designated the airport as an MRZ under the 1992 enactment of the Arizona Defense Restructuring and M ilitary Reuse Zone Programs, and remained an MRZ until July 2006. On October 19, 2006, Executive Order 2006-15 designated the airport as an MRZ for ten years. Executive Order 2015-11 continued the designation until October 19, 2026, when it is set to expire. After executing a lease with a term of 15 years or longer for the use or occupancy of real property or improvements that are located on a closed military facility with a runway that is at least 8,000 feet long at closing or after title to any part of a closed military facility with a runway that is at least 8,000 feet long at closing is transferred to Arizona or to another public or private entity, the governor, after consulting with the CEO of the Arizona Commerce Authority (ACA), may designate the property as a MRZ (A.R.S. 41-1531). Provisions 1. Continues the designation of the Phoenix-Mesa Gateway Airport as an MRZ. 2. Extends the date of termination for the MRZ to October 19, 2031. 3. Requires the Secretary of State to transmit copies of the continuation to the City of Phoenix and the City of Mesa. ☐ Prop 105 (45 votes) ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes) ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note