Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1174 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/29/2024

                    Assigned to MAPS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1174 
 
tuition; family; posttraumatic stress; suicide 
Purpose 
Retroactive to taxable periods beginning July 1, 2023, requires the Arizona Board of 
Regents (ABOR) or a community college district (CCD) to provide a tuition waiver scholarship to 
a child or spouse of a deceased veteran or member of the U.S. Armed Forces, or a current or 
previous peace officer or firefighter if the person meets the requirements as outlined and the parent 
or spouse committed suicide while having a documented posttraumatic stress injury that occurred 
in the line of duty.  
Background 
ABOR and CCDs must grant a tuition waiver scholarship to attend any university or 
community college under its jurisdiction to: 1) a verified child or spouse of a peace officer, 
correctional officer, firefighter, emergency paramedic or member of the National Guard or U.S. 
Armed Forces who resided or was stationed in Arizona and was killed or died from injuries 
suffered in the line of duty while traveling to or from duty; 2) an Arizona National Guard member 
who received a Purple Heart citation on or after September 11, 2001; 3) an Arizona National Guard 
member who was medically discharged due to an injury suffered during active duty, in training 
status or in response to a Governor-declared state of emergency; and 4) a U.S. Armed Forces 
member or former member who was residing or stationed in Arizona at the time of an injury that 
resulted in a Purple Heart citation and whose U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs (U.S. VA) 
disability rating is at least 50 percent (military personnel with a Purple Heart and disability rating 
of at least 50 percent). A tuition waiver recipient who is a child of the outlined individuals must 
be 30 years old or younger, and a recipient who is a spouse must not be remarried. The tuition 
waiver is limited to 64 community college credit hours and a total number of credits equal to the 
number required for a baccalaureate degree at a public university (A.R.S. ยง 15-1808). 
If ABOR is required to provide tuition waiver scholarships to a child or spouse of a 
deceased veteran or member of the U.S. Armed Forces, or a current or previous peace officer or 
firefighter, then there may be an impact to the state General Fund.  
Provisions 
1. Requires ABOR and CCDs to provide a person with a tuition waiver scholarship to attend any 
university or community college that the person meets the admission requirements for, is under 
the jurisdiction of ABOR or the CCD and if: 
a) the applicant is verified by the Peace Officers Memorial Board, the Arizona Fallen 
Firefighter Memorial Committee or the Arizona Department of Veterans' Services to be a 
child or spouse of a deceased: 
i. veteran of the U.S. Armed Forces; 
ii. current peace officer or firefighter; 
iii. previous peace officer or firefighter; or 
iv. member of the U.S. Armed Forces; and  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1174 
Page 2 
 
 
b) the parent or spouse was a resident of Arizona at the time of death; 
c) the parent or spouse suffered a posttraumatic stress injury in the line of duty; and 
d) the parent or spouse died by suicide. 
2. Specifies that it is not a requirement that the parent or spouse was employed as a peace officer, 
firefighter or was serving on active duty as a member of the U.S. Armed Forces at the time of 
death. 
3. Specifies that a person who meets the requirements as outlined is eligible to receive a tuition 
waiver scholarship regardless of the date on which the person's parent or spouse suffered the 
posttraumatic stress injury or committed suicide. 
4. Specifies that a person who is eligible to receive a tuition waiver scholarship and who did not 
receive one in the 2023-2024 or 2024-2025 school year, or both, is eligible for reimbursement 
in an amount equal to the tuition waiver scholarship award that the person was eligible to 
receive for each school year.  
5. Establishes the following items as prima facie evidence that the parent or spouse suffered a 
posttraumatic stress injury in the line of duty: 
a) a disability pension for a posttraumatic stress injury; 
b) a Public Safety Personnel Retirement System plan disability benefit for a posttraumatic 
stress injury; 
c) a discharge or other document from the U.S. Armed Forces showing that the member or 
veteran was discharged due to a posttraumatic stress injury; or 
d) documentation from the U.S. VA showing that the member or veteran suffered from a 
posttraumatic stress injury. 
6. Requires ABOR to distribute surplus monies that were appropriated to the Spouses of Military 
Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund to each university under ABOR's jurisdiction for the costs 
associated with the tuition waiver scholarships. 
7. Repeals, on January 1, 2029, the requirement for ABOR to provide a tuition waiver scholarship 
to a child or spouse of a deceased veteran or member of the U.S. Armed Forces, or a current 
or previous peace officer or firefighter. 
8. Makes technical and conforming changes. 
9. Becomes effective on the general effective date, retroactive to July 1, 2023.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
January 29, 2024 
ZD/KK/cs