Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1178 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/26/2024

                    Assigned to HHS & APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B.1178 
 
hospital interconnectivity; appropriation 
Purpose 
Requires the Health Care Interoperability Grant Program (Grant Program), administered 
by the Arizona Department of Administration (ADOA), to provide a single grant to a company 
that licenses an interoperability software technology solution to support acute care for outlined 
facilities. Appropriates $12,000,000 from the state General Fund (state GF) in FY 2025 to ADOA 
for the single grant.   
Background 
In 2022, the Legislature appropriated $12,000,000 to ADOA to establish a three-year 
competitive grant program that provides interoperability software technology solutions to support 
rural hospitals, health care providers and urban trauma centers to further treatment care 
coordination with a focus on reducing public and private health care costs and unnecessary 
transportation costs. The software must be made available to participating rural hospitals, health 
care providers and urban trauma centers by enabling a hospital's electronic medical records system 
to interface with other electronic medical records systems and providers to promote connectivity 
between hospital systems and providers to promote connectivity between hospital systems and 
facilitate increased communication between hospital staff and providers that use different or 
distinctive online platforms and information systems when treating patients. The interoperability 
software technology solution and grant applicant must meet outlined requirements to be eligible 
for a grant. ADOA must award the first grant by December 31, 2022. The Grant Program 
terminates on June 30, 2026 (A.R.S. ยง 41-703.01; Laws 2022, Ch. 313 and 314). 
In FY 2024 the Legislature made a one-time appropriation of $3,000,000 from the state GF 
to the Grant Program and modified the Grant Program to require the grant of $3,000,000 to be 
awarded to a single company who licenses an interoperability software that is available to current 
and future health care providers though a mobile native smartphone application (Laws 2023, 
Ch.133 and 139). 
S.B.1178 appropriates $12,000,000 from the state GF in FY 2025 to ADOA. 
Provisions 
1. Requires ADOA to administer the Grant Program to provide a single grant to a company that 
licenses an interoperability software technology solution to support acute care for rural 
hospitals, health care providers and trauma centers with resources to further treatment and care 
coordination. 
2. Extends the Grant Program permanently.   FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1178 
Page 2 
 
 
3. Appropriates $12,000,000 from the state GF in FY 2025 to ADOA to administer the grant 
award. 
4. Extends the deadline for ADOA to award the grant from December 31, 2022, to December 31, 2024. 
5. Prohibits the grant recipient from using a third-party vendor to comply with any Grant Program 
requirements.  
6. Requires the Grant Program to enable the implementation of a single licensed interoperability 
software technology solution that is accessible to current and future health care providers via 
a mobile, native smartphone application. 
7. Modifies the requirements of the interoperability software technology solution to include the 
ability to: 
a) enable a hospital's electronic medical records system to interface with interoperability 
technology;  
b) enable providers to promote mobile connectivity between hospital systems and facilitate 
increased communication between hospital staff and providers that use different or 
distinctive mobile platforms when treating acute patients; 
c) provide proactive alerts to health care providers on their smartphones or a smart device; 
d) allow for synchronous and asynchronous communication via a native smartphone 
application; and  
e) be mobile and capable of being used on multiple electronic devices.  
8. Requires the mobile technology to include, at a minimum, the industry standard built-in 
application for the two most popular operating systems and a built-in application available to 
all users. 
9. Requires the grant recipient to demonstrate that its interoperability software technology 
solution meets all outlined requirements at least 30 days before applying for the grant. 
10. Requires the interoperability software technology solution license to be renewed annually. 
11. Exempts the appropriation from lapsing. 
12. Defines mobile and native.  
13. Makes technical and conforming changes. 
14. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
January 26, 2024 
MM/KS/slp