Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1184 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2024

                    Assigned to TTMC 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1184 
 
continuation; department of transportation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Transportation (ADOT) for four years. 
Background 
Established in 1973 to provide an integrated and balanced state transportation system, 
ADOT is granted the exclusive control and jurisdiction over state highways and routes,  
state-owned airports and all state-owned transportation systems and must register motor vehicles 
and aircrafts, license drivers, collect revenues, enforce motor vehicle and aviation statutes and 
perform related transportation planning functions. In order to carry out these responsibilities, 
ADOT is organized into six divisions: 1) motor vehicle; 2) transportation planning; 3) highways; 
4) aeronautics; 5) public transit; and 6) administrative services. ADOT also works cooperatively 
with regional transportation planning organizations, as well as county and local authorities, on 
transportation-related projects and development (A.R.S. §§ 28-331 and 28-332). 
ADOT receives funding through legislative appropriation, non-appropriated funds and 
federal funds, as well as private sources, including donations and fees. ADOT's operating budget 
for FY 2025 includes $251,996,900 and 3,402 full-time equivalent positions (JLBC). 
The Joint Senate Transportation and Technology and House of Representatives 
Transportation and Infrastructure Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on 
January 4, 2024, to receive public testimony and review and evaluate ADOT's response to the 
sunset review factors and special audits conducted by the Office of the Auditor General. The COR 
recommended that ADOT be continued for four to six years (COR Report). ADOT terminates on 
July 1, 2024, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.25). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, ADOT until July 1, 2028. 
2. Repeals ADOT on January 1, 2029. 
3. Contains a purpose statement.  
4. Makes conforming changes. 
5. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision, as noted. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 1, 2024 
KJA/slp