Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1184 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/21/2024

                      	SB 1184 
Initials JB 	Page 1 Transportation & Infrastructure 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: TTMC DPA 4-3-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 17-11-2-0 
 
SB 1184: transportation department; continuation; prohibitions 
Sponsor: Senator Farnsworth, LD 10 
Committee on Transportation & Infrastructure 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Department of Transportation (ADOT) for an amount of time 
contingent on ADOT's implementation of the Auditor General's recommendations directed in 
its sunset review and performance audits. Outlines restrictions for AODT's use of public 
monies and resources.  
History 
Arizona Department of Transportation 
Laws 1973, Chapter 146 established ADOT to provide for an integrated and balanced state 
transportation system with a director responsible for the Department's administration 
(A.R.S. § 28-331). ADOT has exclusive control and jurisdiction over state highways, state 
routes, state-owned airports and all state-owned transportation systems or modes.  
The duties of ADOT are as follows: 1) register motor vehicles and aircraft, license drivers, 
collect revenues, enforce motor vehicle and aviation statutes and perform related functions; 
2) do multimodal state transportation planning, cooperate and coordinate transportation 
planning with local governments and establish an annually updated priority program of 
capital improvements for all transportation modes; 3) design and construct transportation 
facilities in accordance with a priority plan and maintain and operate state highways, state-
owned airports and state public transportation systems; 4) investigate new transportation 
systems and cooperate with and advise local governments concerning the development and 
operation of public transit systems; 5) have administrative jurisdiction of transportation 
safety programs and implement them following applicable law; and 6) operate a state motor 
vehicle fleet for all motor vehicles that are owned, leased or rented by this state (A.R.S. § 28-
332). 
ADOT terminates on July 1, 2024, unless legislation is enacted for its continuation (A.R.S. § 
41-3024.25). 
Senate Transportation and Technology and House Transportation and 
Infrastructure Committee of Reference (COR) 
On January 4, 2024, the COR met jointly to conduct a review of ADOT and recommended 
that ADOT be continued for four to six years. The report of the Committee of Reference can 
be found here.  
 
 
    	SB 1184 
Initials JB 	Page 2 Transportation & Infrastructure 
Provisions 
1. Declares that ADOT's termination date is contingent on ADOT's implementation of the 
Auditor General's recommendations directed in its sunset review and performance audits. 
(Sec. 3)  
2. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, ADOT until: 
a) July 1, 2029, if ADOT has implemented less than 80% of the Auditor General's 
recommendations; 
b) July 1, 2030, if ADOT has implemented at least 80% but less than 90% of the Auditor 
General's recommendations;  
c) July 1, 2031, if ADOT has implemented at least 90% but less than 100% of the Auditor 
General's recommendations; or 
d) July 1, 2032, if ADOT has implemented 100% of the Auditor General's 
recommendations. (Sec. 3, 5) 
3. Requires the Auditor General to write a follow-up report 18 months after the Sunset 
Review Report that states the percentage of Auditor General recommendations that 
ADOT has implemented. (Sec. 3) 
4. Declares that ADOT's termination date will be based on the information stated in the 
Auditors General's follow-up report. (Sec. 3) 
5. Requires the Auditor General to provide the follow-up report to the President of the 
Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Governor. (Sec. 3) 
6. Stipulates that a dispute regarding the Auditor General's determination of the percentage 
of implemented recommendations may onl y be overcome by clear and convincing 
evidence. (Sec. 3) 
7. Repeals ADOT on January 1 of the year immediately following ADOT's termination date. 
(Sec. 3) 
8. Prohibits ADOT from spending public monies or using public resources to: 
a) build or maintain facilities that charge motor vehicles except that ADOT may fund 
the installation of charging equipment on government-owned property to charge 
government-owned motor vehicles;  
b) require employees to engage in training, orientation or therapy that presents any form 
of blame or judgment on the basis of race, ethnicity or sex. If ADOT violates this 
requirement, ADOT must pay to the aggrieved employee an amount equal to the 
public monies that were spent or the value of public resources that were used; or 
c) develop a carbon reduction plan or a plan or strategy to reduce greenhouse gas 
emissions, except that ADOT may develop a plan if necessary to accept federal monies. 
ADOT may not implement any strategies identified in the plan without express 
legislative authorization. (Sec 1) 
9. Includes a purpose statement. (Sec. 4)  
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note