Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1255 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 04/22/2024

                    Senate Engrossed   physical therapy board; continuation           State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024           CHAPTER 160       SENATE BILL 1255              An Act   repealing section 41-3024.02, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.02; relating to the board of physical therapy.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed   physical therapy board; continuation
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
CHAPTER 160
SENATE BILL 1255

Senate Engrossed

 

physical therapy board; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-sixth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2024

 

 

 

CHAPTER 160

 

SENATE BILL 1255

 

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3024.02, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.02; relating to the board of physical therapy.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.02, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.02, to read: START_STATUTE41-3032.02. Board of physical therapy; termination July 1, 2032 A. The board of physical therapy terminates on July 1, 2032. B. Title 32, chapter 19 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of physical therapy to promote the safe and professional practice of physical therapy in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3024.02, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.02, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3032.02. Board of physical therapy; termination July 1, 2032

A. The board of physical therapy terminates on July 1, 2032.

B. Title 32, chapter 19 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of physical therapy to promote the safe and professional practice of physical therapy in this state.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024.