Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1255 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/16/2024

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1255 
 
physical therapy board; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Board of Physical Therapy (Board) for eight years. 
Background 
The Board was established to regulate the practice of physical therapy in Arizona, certify 
qualified applicants and take enforcement action and disciplinary action against licensees, as 
necessary. Board duties include: 1) evaluating, licensing and certifying qualified applicants;  
2) providing for and adopting passing scores for national examinations for physical therapists and 
physical therapist assistants; 3) establishing mechanisms to assess continued professional 
competence of physical therapists and physical therapist assistants; 4) maintaining a current list 
including the names, current business and residential addresses, telephone numbers and license or 
certificate numbers of all persons regulated by the Board; 5) annually publishing final disciplinary 
actions taken against a licensee or certificate holder; 6) annually publishing board rulings, 
opinions, and interpretations of statutes of rules to guide physical therapists and physical therapist 
assistants; 7) entering into contracts for services as necessary to carry out the Board's duties; 
8) meeting at least once every quarter; and 9) providing information to the public regarding the 
board, its processes and consumer rights (A.R.S. § 32-2003). 
The Board consists of seven members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) four 
physical therapists residing in Arizona that possess an unrestricted license to practice physical 
therapy and have been practicing in Arizona for at least five years before their appointment; 2) one 
physical therapist assistant residing in Arizona that possesses an unrestricted physical therapist 
assistant certificate; and 3) two public members residing in Arizona who are not affiliated with or 
have a financial interest in any health care profession but do have an interest in consumer rights. 
Members are appointed to staggered four-year terms. Members may not serve more than two 
successive terms or for more than 10 consecutive years. Members, upon request of the Board, can 
be removed by the Governor for misconduct, incompetence or neglect of duty (A.R.S. § 32-2002). 
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 11, 2024, to review and evaluate the Board's response to the sunset review 
factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the Board be continued for eight 
years until July 1, 2032 (COR Report). The Board is set to terminate on July 1, 2024, unless 
continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.02). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
   FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1255 
Page 2 
 
 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, the Board until July 1, 2032. 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2033. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 15, 2024 
MM/DM/slp