Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1255 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2024

                      	SB 1255 
Initials AG/KT 	Page 1 	House Engrossed 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DP 7-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 24-6-0-0 
House: HHS DP 7-1-0-2  
 
SB 1255: physical therapy board; continuation 
Sponsor: Senator Shope, LD 16 
House Engrossed 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Board of Physical Therapy (Board) for 8 years.  
History 
Laws 1952, Chapter 36 created the Board to regulate the practice of physical therapy in 
Arizona, certify qualified applicants and take enforcement action and disciplinary action as 
necessary. Board responsibilities include: 1) evaluating, licensing and certifying qualified 
applicants; 2) providing national examinations and determining passing scores for physical 
therapists and physical therapist assistants; 3) establishing mechanisms to assess continued 
professional competence of physical therapists and physical therapist assistants; 4) 
maintaining a current list of all persons regulated by the board; 5) publishing final 
disciplinary actions taken against a licensee or certificate holder; 6) entering into contracts 
for services as necessary to carry out the Board's duties; and 7) providing information to the 
public regarding the board, its processes and consumer rights (A.R.S. § 32-2003).  
The Board consists of seven members appointed by the Governor to staggered four-year 
terms. Members may not serve more than two successive terms or for more than ten 
consecutive years. The Board is required to meet at least once per quarter (A.R.S. §§ 32-2002 
and 32-2003). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference met jointly on January 11, 2024, to conduct a review of the Board. Both 
Committees of Reference recommended the Board be continued for eight years (COR Report).  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, the Board until July 1, 2032. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2033. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note