Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1257 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/16/2024

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1257 
 
department of child safety; continuation. 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Child Safety (DCS) for four years. 
Background 
Laws 2014, Second Special Session, Chapter 1, established DCS to protect children by: 1) 
investigating reports of abuse and neglect; 2) assessing, promoting and supporting the safety of 
children in a safe and stable family or any other appropriate placement in response to allegations 
of abuse or neglect; 3) working cooperatively with law enforcement in regard to reports that 
include criminal conduct allegations; 4) coordinating services to achieve and maintain permanency 
for children without compromising their safety; and 5) strengthening families and providing 
prevention, intervention and treatment services (A.R.S. § 8-451). DCS is overseen by a Governor-
appointed director that must have administrative experience in both the protection of children and 
family support services, as well as possess the necessary qualifications and training to manage 
DCS affairs (A.R.S. § 8-452). 
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 3, 2024, to review and evaluate DCS's response to the sunset review factors 
and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that DCS be continued for four years until 
July 1, 2028 (COR Report). DCS is set to terminate on July 1, 2024, unless continued by the 
Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.06). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, DCS until July 1, 2028. 
2. Repeals DCS on January 1, 2029. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 15, 2024 
MM/DM/slp