Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1257 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/22/2024

                    Assigned to HHS 	AS PASSED BY COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1257 
 
department of child safety; continuation. 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Child Safety (DCS) for four years. Removes the 
requirement that legislators and legislative staff members sign a form outlining confidentiality 
laws and penalties before requesting access to DCS information.  
Background 
Laws 2014, Second Special Session, Chapter 1, established DCS to protect children by:  
1) investigating reports of abuse and neglect; 2) assessing, promoting and supporting the safety of 
children in a safe and stable family or any other appropriate placement in response to allegations of 
abuse or neglect; 3) working cooperatively with law enforcement in regard to reports that include 
criminal conduct allegations; 4) coordinating services to achieve and maintain permanency for 
children without compromising their safety; and 5) strengthening families and providing prevention, 
intervention and treatment services (A.R.S. § 8-451). DCS is overseen by a Governor-appointed 
director that must have administrative experience in both the protection of children and family 
support services, as well as possess the necessary qualifications and training to manage DCS affairs 
(A.R.S. § 8-452). 
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 3, 2024, to review and evaluate DCS's response to the sunset review factors 
and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that DCS be continued for four years until 
July 1, 2028 (COR Report). DCS is set to terminate on July 1, 2024, unless continued by the 
Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.06). 
Federal law requires DCS to maintain information regarding its investigations. This 
information is confidential, but if it is necessary to promote the safety and well-being of children, 
DCS may share its information with a variety of entities, including legislators who request the 
information in the regular course of their duties. Current statute allows a legislator to discuss this 
information with another legislator only if the other legislator, along with any legislative staff 
member, has signed a form that outlines the confidentiality laws governing DCS files and penalties 
for further release of the information (A.R.S. § 8-807). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, DCS until July 1, 2028.  FACT SHEET – Amended 
S.B. 1257 
Page 2 
 
 
2. Repeals DCS on January 1, 2029. 
3. Removes the requirement that legislators and legislative staff members sign a form outlining 
confidentiality laws and penalties before requesting access to DCS information. 
4. Contains a purpose statement. 
5. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Amendments Adopted by Committee 
• Removes the requirement that legislators and legislative staff members sign a form outlining 
confidentiality laws and penalties before requesting access to DCS information. 
Senate Action 
HHS  2/20/24 DPA 5-2-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 22, 2024 
MM/DM/slp