Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1258 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/16/2024

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1258 
 
foster care review board; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Foster Care Review Board (FCRB) for four years. 
Background 
The primary role of FCRB is to advise juvenile courts on progress toward achieving a 
permanent home for children involved in a dependency case and in out-of-home care. FCRB 
consists of 123 local foster care review boards (local boards) and one State Foster Care Review 
Board (State Board). The State Board provides recommendations to the Arizona Supreme Court, 
Governor and Legislature regarding foster care statutes, policies and procedures. The State Board 
consists of three members appointed by the Arizona Supreme Court that have knowledge of the 
problems of foster care, as well as: 1) in counties with only one local board, one juvenile  
court-appointed local board member; and 2) in counties with more than one local board, one 
juvenile court-appointed local board member for every 10 boards in the county, not exceeding six 
members in total. Members of the State Board who are local board members serve terms that are 
coterminous with their local board terms. Members appointed by the Arizona Supreme Court serve 
terms that are at least two years long, not exceeding five years (Arizona Supreme Court and A.R.S. 
§ 8-515.04). 
A local board, consisting of five volunteer members, is established in each county for every 
100 children placed in out-of-home care. Statute requires local boards to review the case of each 
child involved in a dependency action and in out-of-home care within six months of the child's 
placement and every six months thereafter, as well as to send reports and recommendations on 
each case to the presiding Juvenile Court Judge, the supervising agency, the child's parents, foster 
parents, counselors, attorneys and other appropriate interested parties within 30 days of the review 
(A.R.S. §§ 8-515-.01 and 8-515.03).  
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 3, 2024, to review and evaluate FCRB's response to the sunset review factors 
and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that FCRB be continued for not more than 
four years, until July 1, 2028. (COR Report). The Board is set to terminate on July 1, 2024, unless 
continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.30). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, FCRB until July 1, 2028.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1258 
Page 2 
 
 
2. Repeals FCRB on January 1, 2029. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 15, 2024 
MM/DM/slp