Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1258 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/21/2024

                      	SB 1258 
Initials AG/MT 	Page 1 	Caucus & COW 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DP 6-0-1-0 | 3rd Read 24-4-2-0 
 House: HHS DP 6-2-0-2   
 
SB 1258: foster care review board; continuation 
Sponsor: Senator Shope, LD 16 
Caucus & COW 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Foster Care Review Board (FCRB) for 4 years and establishes 
reporting requirements.  
History 
Established in the Arizona Supreme Court, FCRB was created in 1978 to advise the juvenile 
court on progress toward achieving a permanent home for children involved in a dependency 
case and in out-of-home care. FCRB consists of more than 123 local foster care review boards 
(local boards). FCRB is required to: 1) meet at least twice per year; 2) review and coordinate 
the activities of local boards; and 3) establish training programs for local board members 
which must include periodic in-service training. The board provides recommendations to the 
Arizona Supreme Court, Governor and Legislature regarding foster care statutes, policies 
and procedures. 
A local board is established in each county for every 100 children placed in out-of-home care. 
The local boards are required to review the case of each child involved in a dependency action 
and in out-of-home care within six months of placement and every six months thereafter. 
(A.R.S. §§ 8-515.01; 8-515.03; 8-515.04; and AOC). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference met jointly on January 19, 2024, to conduct a review of FCRB. Both Committees 
of Reference recommended that FCRB be continued for four years (COR Report).  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, the FCRB until July 1, 2028. (Sec. 3, 5) 
2. Repeals the FCRB on January 1, 2029. (Sec. 3) 
3. Requires FCRB to create an annual report that includes: 
a) the number of times FCRB failed to submit reports to the juvenile court within a time 
frame that allows sufficient time for judicial review before a dependency hearing; 
b) FCRB's progress in facilitating and increasing parent and foster parent attendance at 
local board reviews; and  
c) the number of times FCRB failed to timely and accurately enter data about child 
dependency cases and local board reviews into the data system. (Sec. 1) 
4. Requires FCRB to submit the annual report to the Governor, the President of the Senate, 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the chairpersons of the Senate and 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	SB 1258 
Initials AG/MT 	Page 2 	Caucus & COW 
House of Representatives Health and Human Services Committees, or their successor 
committees by November 1 of each year. (Sec. 1) 
5. Requires FCRB to submit a copy of the annual report to the Secretary of State. (Sec. 1) 
6. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 4) 
7. Makes technical and conforming changes. (Sec. 1, 2)