Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1260 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/23/2024

                      	SB 1260 
Initials EB/BSR 	Page 1 Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: NREW DPA 7-0-0-0 | 3rd Read 24-2-4-0 
 
SB 1260: dog racing; simulcast wagering; prohibition 
Sponsor: Senator Kavanagh, LD 3 
Committee on Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs 
Overview 
Prohibits simulcast dog racing in Arizona beginning on specified dates.  
History 
The Arizona Department of Gaming Division of Racing, in accordance with the Arizona 
Racing Commission, regulates and supervises all racing meetings and authorizes pari-
mutuel wagering on races that occur inside and outside of Arizona (A.R.S. § 5-104).  
Pari-mutuel wagering means a system of betting that provides for the distribution among the 
winning patrons of at least the total amount wagered less the amount withheld under state 
law (A.R.S. § 5-101). 
Simulcast means the telecast shown within this state of live audio and visual signals of races 
conducted at an out-of-state track or the telecast shown outside this state of live audio and 
visual signals of races originating within this state for the purpose of pari-mutuel wagering 
(A.R.S. § 5-101). 
Prior to 2016, greyhound racetracks operated in Yuma, Black Canyon City, Tucson, Phoenix 
and Apache Junction. Tucson was the last operating greyhound track and held its last official 
dog race after 72 years of racing on Saturday, June 25, 2016 (Greyhound Racing). 
Laws 2016, Chapter 246 prohibited live dog racing in Arizona beginning on January 1, 2017. 
However, wagering on simulcast dog races is permissible in Arizona meaning any person, 
within a racetrack enclosure or an additional facility authorized for wagering, may wager on 
the results of a race televised to the racetrack or facility (A.R.S. §§ 5-110, 5-112).  
Provisions 
1. Prohibits simulcast dog racing in Arizona on or after December 31, 2028. (Sec. 2) 
2. Restricts simulcast dog racing that originates outside of the continental United States on 
or after June 30, 2024. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a retroactivity clause of July 1, 2024. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes technical changes. (Sec. 1 and 2) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note