Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1429 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/05/2024

                    Assigned to ELEC 	AS PASSED BY COW 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
REVISED 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1429 
 
candidates; electronic signatures; limit 
Purpose 
An emergency measure that specifies that petition signatures collected through an 
electronic petition with the August 6, 2024, primary date that comply with the statutory 
requirements are valid. Effective January 1, 2025, allows outlined candidates to collect up to 125 
percent of the number of required nomination petition signatures by using the online signature 
collection system (online system). Contains requirements for enactment for initiatives and 
referendums (Proposition 105). 
Background 
Statute outlines requirements relating to the nomination of candidates on the official ballot 
of a general or special election. Statute prescribes the minimum number of signatures that a 
nomination petition must include as follows: 1) at least one-fourth of the qualified signers in the 
state, for the office of U.S. senator or a state office excluding members of the Legislature; 2) at 
least one-half of one percent of the qualified signers in the district, for the office of U.S. 
Representative; 3) at least one-half of one percent of all the qualified signers in the district, for the 
office of Arizona senator or representative; 4) at least one percent of the qualified signers in the 
county or district, for a county office or superior court judge; 5) at least two percent or 10 qualified 
signatures of the same party in the precinct, for a county precinct committee; and 6) at least five 
percent of the qualified signers in the city or town, for a city or town office. The Secretary of State 
must provide a system for the qualified signers to sign the nomination petition for candidates for 
a congressional office, legislative office, city or town office, county office and the office of the 
precinct committeeman through a secure internet portal. The online system must allow only the 
qualified electors who are eligible to sign a petition for a particular candidate to sign the petition 
and provide a method to verify the elector's identity. A candidate may collect up to the minimum 
number of required nomination petition signatures through the online system (A.R.S. Title 16, 
Chapter 3). 
Laws 2024, Chapter 1 moved the 2024 primary election date from August 6, 2024, to July 
30, 2024.  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
 
  FACT SHEET – Amended/Revised  
S.B. 1429 
Page 2 
 
 
Provisions 
1. Increases, beginning January 1, 2025, from 100 to 125, the percentage of the number of 
required nomination petition signatures a candidate may collect using the online system, 
including a candidate for: 
a) U.S. Congress; 
b) city office; 
c) town office; 
d) county office; or 
e) precinct committeeman office. 
2. Increases, beginning January 1, 2025, the number of required nomination petition signatures 
or contribution qualification forms that a candidate for legislative or state office may collect 
using the online system, from 100 percent to 125 percent of the minimum number of required 
signatures, subject to the affirmative vote of at least three-fourths of the members of each house 
of the Legislature (Proposition 105). 
3. Requires any election item that was duly called by a city, town or county for the August 6, 
2024, primary election to be placed on the ballot for the newly designated primary election 
date of July 30, 2024. 
4. Prohibits a filing officer from rejecting signatures or petitions based solely on the date of the 
primary election that is on a petition form. 
5. Specifies that a person does not have to file a new or amended statement of interest based 
solely on the change to the 2024 primary election date.  
6. Specifies that signatures collected through an electronic petition with the August 6, 2024, 
primary date and that otherwise comply with the requirements provided by law are valid 
signatures. 
7. Requires the voter of a conditional provisional ballot to provide proof of identification to the 
county recorder or other officer in charge of elections by:  
a) the fifth business day after a primary, general or special election that includes a federal 
office; or  
b) the third business day after any other election. 
8. Specifies that the city or town clerks' offices that must be open during the prescribed 
timeframes are upon an agreement with a county to be used as a location at which a voter may 
submit proof of identification. 
9. Specifies that the regular business hours for city, town and county offices must be at least 8:00 
a.m. to 5:00 p.m. 
10. Contains an applicability clause.  
11. Makes technical changes. 
12. Becomes effective on the signature of the Governor, if the emergency clause is enacted.   FACT SHEET – Amended/Revised  
S.B. 1429 
Page 3 
 
 
Amendments Adopted by Committee of the Whole 
1. Requires any election item that was duly called by a city, town or county for the August 6, 
2024, primary election to be placed on the ballot for the newly designated primary election 
date. 
2. Prohibits the filing officer from rejecting signatures or petitions based solely on the date of the 
primary election that is on a petition form. 
3. Specifies that signatures collected through an electronic petition with the August 6, 2024, 
primary date and that otherwise comply with the requirements provided by law are valid 
signatures. 
4. Requires the voter of a conditional provisional ballot to provide proof of identification to the 
county recorder or other officer in charge of elections by: 
a) the fifth business day after a primary, general or special election that includes a federal 
office; or 
b) the third business day after any other election. 
5. Adds an emergency clause. 
6. Specifies that the city or town clerks' offices that must be open during the prescribed 
timeframes are upon agreement of a county to be used as a location at which a voter may 
submit proof of identification. 
7. Makes conforming changes. 
Revisions 
• Corrects the provisions to reflect the accurate effective date. 
Senate Action  
ELEC  2/12/24  DP  6-0-2 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 29, 2024 
AN/HS/cs