Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1455 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2024

                    Assigned to FICO 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1455 
 
public school tax credit; purposes 
Purpose 
Makes permanent specified purposes for which a public school may use monies contributed 
for the purposes of the Public School Extracurricular Activity Fees Tax Credit.  
Background 
Statute allows for a credit against individual income tax liability for fees paid or cash 
contributions made to a public school for: 1) standardized testing for college credit or readiness; 
2) the career and technical education industry certification assessment; 3) preparation courses and 
materials for standardized testing; 4) cardiopulmonary resuscitation training; 5) extracurricular 
activities; and 6) character education programs. Laws 2019, Chapter 164 authorized additional 
purposes for contributions until June 30, 2022, including: 1) the acquisition of specified capital 
items; 2) community school meal programs; 3) student consumable health care supplies; and  
4) playground equipment and shade structures for playground equipment. In 2021, the Legislature 
extended the expiration date for the additional authorized purposes until June 30, 2024 (Laws 
2021, Ch. 412) 
For the purposes of the Public School Extracurricular Activity Fees Tax Credit, a  
public school is a school that is a part of a school district, a career technical education district or a 
charter school (A.R.S. ยง 43-1089.01). 
If making the additional authorized contribution categories permanent results in a change 
to the amount of contributions, there may be a fiscal impact to the state General Fund. 
Provisions 
1. Removes the June 30, 2024, expiration date for the following authorized purposes of 
contributions made to a public school: 
a) the acquisition of outlined capital items; 
b) community school meal programs;  
c) student consumable health care supplies; and   
d) playground equipment and shade structures for playground equipment.  
2. Makes conforming changes.  
3. Becomes effective on the general effective date, retroactive to July 1, 2024. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 1, 2024 
MG/cs