Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1480 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/22/2024

                    Assigned to APPROP 	AS PASSED BY COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1480 
 
executive officers; salaries 
Purpose 
Prescribes salaries for various state executive officers. 
Background 
The Commission on Salaries for Elective Officers (Commission) must biennially conduct 
a review of the rates of pay of elective state officers, justices and judges of courts of record, and 
superior court clerks for the purpose of determining and providing the pay levels appropriate to 
the duties and responsibilities of the respective offices and positions. By June 1 of each year, the 
Commission must submit to the Governor a report of the results of each review conducted by the 
Commission (A.R.S. § 41-1903). 
In the budget transmitted to the Legislature after the date of the submission of the report 
and recommendations of the Commission, the Governor must include recommendations for the 
exact rates of pay for outlined elective officers, judges, justices and superior court clerks. The 
Governor's recommendations become effective on the first Monday of January in the calendar year 
following the transmittal of the recommendations in the budget, unless, within 90 days of the 
transmittal: 1) no statute has been enacted to establish rates of pay other than those proposed by 
the recommendations; and 2) neither house of the Legislature specifically disapproves of the 
recommendations (A.R.S. § 41-1904). 
The FY 2024 State Budget appropriated monies for the salaries of various elected officials, 
including: 1) $95,000 for the salary of the Governor; 2) $70,000 for the salary of the Secretary of 
State (SOS); 3) $70,000 for the salary of the State Treasurer; 4) $90,000 for the salary of the 
Attorney General (AG); 5) $85,000 for the salary of the Superintendent of Public Instruction; and 
6) $212,000 for the salary of the Arizona Supreme Court Chief Justice (JLBC). 
S.B. 1480 prescribes salaries for various state executive officers, which would annually 
necessitate $975,000 from the state General Fund. 
Provisions 
1. Prescribes statutory salaries for specified state executive officers, rather than requiring the 
Commission and Governor to make salary recommendations for those offices. 
2. Deems, beginning January 2025, the Superintendent of Public Education, eligible to receive 
an annual salary of $150,000.  FACT SHEET – Amended  
S.B. 1480 
Page 2 
 
 
3. Deems, beginning January 1, 2027, the Governor eligible to receive an annual salary of 
$165,000. 
4. Requires, beginning January 1, 2027, the SOS to receive an annual salary of $160,000. 
5. Deems, beginning January 1, 2027, the State Treasurer eligible to receive an annual salary of 
$150,000. 
6. Entitles, beginning January 1, 2027, the AG to receive an annual salary of $170,000. 
7. Deems, beginning January 1, 2027, the Lieutenant Governor eligible to receive an annual 
salary of $165,000. 
8. Requires the AG to be a licensed attorney at law and in good standing in Arizona, rather than 
a practicing attorney before the Arizona Supreme Court for at least five years. 
9. Makes technical changes. 
10. Becomes effective on the general effective date.   
Amendments Adopted by Committee 
1. Deems, beginning January 2025, the Superintendent of Public Education, eligible to receive 
an annual salary of $150,000. 
2. Deems, beginning January 1, 2027, the Governor eligible to receive an annual salary of 
$165,000, rather than $220,000 or an amount equal to the annual salary of the Chief Justice of 
the Arizona Supreme Court, whichever is less, beginning January 1, 2025. 
3. Requires, beginning January 1, 2027, the SOS to receive an annual salary of $160,000, rather 
than $185,000 beginning January 1, 2025. 
4. Deems, beginning January 1, 2027, the State Treasurer eligible to receive an annual salary of 
$150,000, rather than $175,000 beginning January 1, 2025. 
5. Entitles, beginning January 1, 2027, the AG to receive an annual salary of $170,000, rather 
than $200,000. 
6. Deems, beginning January 1, 2026, the Lieutenant Governor eligible to receive an annual 
salary of $165,000, rather than $195,000. 
7. Requires the AG to be a licensed attorney at law and in good standing in Arizona, rather than 
a practicing attorney before the Arizona Supreme Court for at least five years. 
Senate Action 
APPROP 2/20/24 DPA 5-4-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 22, 2024 
LMM/SDR/cs