Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1511 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/14/2024

                      	SB 1511 
Initials AG/MT 	Page 1 	Transmitted 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DP 5-2-0-0 |3
rd
 Read 16-12-0-0 
House: HHS DP 5-4-0-1 | 3
rd
 Read 31-29-0-0  
 
SB 1511: insurance; gender surgeries; documentation; reports 
Sponsor: Senator Shamp, LD 29 
Transmitted to the Governor 
Overview 
Forbids a health insurer that provides coverage for gender transition procedures to deny 
coverage for gender detransition procedures. Requires health care providers who perform 
gender transition procedures to provide gender detransition procedures and contains 
reporting requirements and session law provisions for updating official documents that 
indicate name, sex and gender. 
History 
Health care insurer is a disability insurer, group disability insurer, blanket disability insurer, 
health care services organization, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or 
hospital, medical, dental and optometric service corporation that issues a health plan in 
Arizona (A.R.S. § 20-3501). 
Gender transition is the process in which a person goes from identifying with and living as a 
gender that corresponds to the person's biological sex to identifying with and living as a 
gender different from the person's biological sex and may involve social, legal or physical 
changes (A.R.S. § 32-3230). 
A physician is a Doctor of Medicine or an Osteopathic physician (A.R.S. § 32-3230). 
Provisions 
Health Insurers  
1. Prohibits any contract that is issued, delivered or renewed by a health insurer that 
provides coverage for gender transition procedures to deny coverage for gender 
detransition procedures beginning on January 1, 2025. (Sec. 1)  
2. Requires a physician, health care institution, other person or entity that is licensed or 
otherwise authorized to furnish health care services in Arizona and performs gender 
transition procedures to agree to provide or pay for the performance of gender 
detransition procedures. (Sec. 1) 
3. Directs a health insurer that provides coverage for gender transition services to submit a 
report to the Department of Insurance and Financial Institutions (DIFI) within 15 days 
after the end of the calendar month during which a claim for a detransition procedure 
was filed. (Sec. 1) 
Department of Insurance and Financial Institutions 
4. Requires DIFI to develop a form for the report to include the following:  
a) the number of insurance claims made for a gender detransition procedure; 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	SB 1511 
Initials AG/MT 	Page 2 	Transmitted 
b) the age and sex of the individual who received the gender detransition procedure; 
c) the date that the individual initially began a prior gender transition procedure, if 
known; and 
d) the state and county of residence of the individual who received the gender 
detransition procedure. (Sec. 1) 
5. Prohibits the DIFI form to include the following: 
a) the name of the individual; 
b) any common identifiers of the individual, including a social security number or driver 
license number; and  
c) any other information that is not required in the DIFI form that would cause the 
individual to be identified. (Sec. 1) 
6. Requires DIFI to prepare an annual statistical report that compiles the information 
submitted in the DIFI form and do the following: 
a) make the statistical report available in a downloadable format; and  
b) submit the report to the Governor, the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the 
House of Representatives and the Secretary of State. (Sec. 1) 
7. Permits the Attorney General to do the following: 
a) investigate a potential violation; 
b) seek production of documents or testimony through a civil investigative subpoena; and  
c) bring an action to enforce compliance. (Sec. 1) 
8. Defines health insurer. (Sec. 1) 
Session Law Provisions 
9. Requires any state agency that issues licenses, certificates, permits or other official 
documents that require a name or sex or gender designation to adopt an expedited 
procedure that allows an individual who is in the process of a gender detransition 
procedure to have the individual's license, certificate, permit or other official document 
changed to the individual's new name and sex or gender designation. (Sec. 2) 
10. Requires a state agency, by December 31, 2025, to identify the licenses, certificates, 
permits or other official documents that an agency issues and identify the current process 
of changing a name or sex or gender designation on the license, certificate, permit or other 
official document and provide a report to the Department of Administration (ADOA).     
(Sec. 2) 
11. Requires a state agency to identify an expedited process for individuals who are in the 
process of a gender detransition procedure to have that individual's license, certificate, 
permit or other official document changed to reflect the individual's new name or sex or 
gender designation and provide a report to ADOA by June 30, 2026. (Sec. 2) 
12. Repeals the session law provisions on January 1, 2027. (Sec. 2)