Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1567 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/08/2024

                    Assigned to TTMC 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1567 
 
off-highway vehicles; education requirements 
Purpose 
 Establishes an Off-Highway Vehicle (OHV) Safety Education Course that is required for 
OHV operation beginning January 1, 2025.  
Background 
An OHV is a motorized vehicle that is operated primarily off of highways and is designed, 
modified or purpose-built primarily for recreational nonhighway all-terrain travel, including a 
tracked or wheeled, utility, all-terrain, four-wheel drive, amphibious or ground effects or air 
cushion vehicle, motorcycle, dune buggy and any other means of land transportation deriving 
motive power from a source other than muscle or wind (A.R.S. § 28-1171). 
A person may not operate or allow the operation of an all-terrain or OHV in Arizona 
without either a resident or nonresident OHV user indicia issued by the Arizona Department of 
Transportation (ADOT), if the vehicle: 1) is designed by the manufacturer primarily for travel over 
unimproved terrain; and 2) has a maximum unladen weight of 2,500 pounds. The vehicle license 
tax for an all-terrain vehicle or OHV is $3 (A.R.S. §§ 28-1177 and 28-5801).  
The Arizona Game and Fish Department (AZGFD) must conduct, or approve, an 
educational course of instruction in OHV safety and environmental ethics that must include 
instruction on OHV uses that limit air pollution and harm to natural terrain, vegetation and animals 
and requires the passage of a written exam to successfully complete the course (A.R.S. § 28-1175).  
 There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Requires AZGFD to conduct or approve an OHV Safety Education Course that must be 
composed of: 
a) a required written knowledge instruction and examination component that is required for 
each operator; and  
b) operational skills instruction and an examination component that is required only for an 
operator who is under 18 years old who does not possess a valid driver license.  
2. Requires the OHV Safety Education Course to include: 
a) the training of OHV operators;  
b) the preparation and dissemination of OHV information and safety advice to the public; and  
c) education relating to both the: 
i) importance of gates and fences used in agriculture and how to properly close a gate; and 
ii) respectful, sustainable and on-trail, OHV operation and respect for communities 
affected by OHV operation.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1567 
Page 2 
 
 
3. Requires, beginning January 1, 2025, a person to complete the OHV Safety Education Course 
and provide ADOT proof of completion before ADOT may issue a resident or nonresident 
OHV indicia.  
4. Requires AZGFD to issue an OHV safety certificate to a person who successfully completes 
training or passes the knowledge and skills test established under the OHV Safety Education 
Course.  
5. Requires AZGFD to ensure a person is able to complete the written component of the OHV 
Safety Education Course online.  
6. Requires ADOT to share with AZGFD all OHV data relating to persons who have provided 
proof of course completion and all user indicias issued by ADOT.  
7. Requires, by December 1, 2026, ADOT to submit a report to the Governor, the President of 
the Senate, Speaker of the House of Representatives and provide a copy of the report to the 
Secretary of State regarding the results of implementing the OHV education requirement, 
including: 
a) the revenues and costs associated with the implementation; and  
b) any recommendations for administrative or legislative action. 
8. Repeals the OHV Safety Education Course and related requirements on June 1, 2027.  
9. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 8, 2024 
KJA/EB/mg