Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1739 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/13/2024

                    Assigned to APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B.1739 
 
criminal justice; 2024-2025. 
Purpose 
Makes statutory and session law changes relating to criminal justice necessary to 
implement the FY 2025 state budget. 
Background 
The Arizona Constitution prohibits substantive law from being included in the general 
appropriations, capital outlay appropriations and supplemental appropriations bills. However, it is 
often necessary to make statutory and session law changes to effectuate the budget. Thus, separate 
bills called budget reconciliation bills (BRBs) are introduced to enact these provisions. Because 
BRBs contain substantive law changes, the Arizona Constitution provides that they become 
effective on the general effective date, unless an emergency clause is enacted. 
S.B. 1739 contains the budget reconciliation provisions for changes relating to criminal 
justice. 
Provisions 
Judiciary 
1. Renames the Court Appointed Special Advocate Fund to the Court Appointed Special Advocate 
and Vulnerable Persons Fund (Court Appointed Persons Fund). 
2. Allows monies in the Court Appointed Persons Fund to be used for court functions benefitting 
vulnerable persons. 
Attorney General (AG) 
3. Delays, from August 27, 2024, to August 27, 2025, the date after which the AG is prohibited 
from using monies in the Anti-Racketeering Revolving Fund to pay for salaries for FTEs in 
the AG's office. 
Department of Public Safety (DPS) 
4. Requires DPS to prioritize applications of in-state residents when issuing a concealed carry 
weapon permit (CCW). 
5. Requires DPS, by July 31 of each year, to report to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee on 
the number of CCWs issued in the prior fiscal year.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1739 
Page 2 
 
 
6. Requires the annual report to include the number of outstanding CCW applications that have 
not been issued, and the average turnround time to issue a CCW. 
7. Allows DPS to use appropriated monies from the Fingerprint Clearance Card Fund for rent 
payments on the Vehicle and Evidence Storage Facility. 
8. Delays, from July 1, 2025, to July 1, 2027, the full implementation date of the Major Incident 
Division within DPS. 
9. Allows monies in the Fentanyl Prosecution, Diversion and Testing Fund (Fentanyl Fund) to be 
used beyond FY 2024 and exempts monies in the Fentanyl Fund from lapsing. 
10. Repeals the Fentanyl Fund on July 1, 2025, and directs any unexpended or unencumbered 
monies in the Fentanyl Fund to be transferred to the state General Fund (state GF). 
Antihuman Trafficking Grant Fund (Anti-Trafficking Fund) 
11. Allows monies in the Anti-Trafficking Fund to be used beyond FY 2024 and exempts monies 
in the Anti-Trafficking Fund from lapsing. 
12. Repeals the Anti-Trafficking Fund on July 1, 2025, and directs any unexpended or 
unencumbered monies to be transferred to the state GF. 
Nonprofit Security Grant Program (Program) (Retroactive to July 1, 2024) 
13. Allows Program monies to be used for hiring permanent or contracted security personnel. 
14. Limits Program funding eligibility to entities that have not received federal funding for the last 
three federal grant cycles, excluding the current federal fiscal year in which the applicant 
applies. 
15. Modifies funding eligibility criteria to require an entity to demonstrate a specified risk or threat 
that either is occurring or has occurred in the two years prior to applying for a grant. 
16. Removes, as eligibility requirements for program funding, that entities must be unable to:  
a) secure a contracted vulnerability assessment; and 
b) apply for funding due to an inability to fund the request up front and wait for 
reimbursement. 
17. Requires the Arizona Department of Homeland Security (AZDOHS) to create an informal 
review panel consisting of at least three members with experience in security risks for 
nonprofits to review AZDOHS's scoring of applications in order to ensure that applications 
meet outlined criteria. 
18. Requires at least one member of the panel to have knowledge of rural nonprofit security needs, 
and at least one member with knowledge of urban nonprofit security needs. 
19. Prohibits members of the panel from receiving compensation or reimbursement for travel 
expenses.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1739 
Page 3 
 
 
20. Exempts monies in the Program Fund from lapsing and directs any unexpended or 
unencumbered monies to be transferred to the state GF after the Program is repealed on 
October 1, 2028. 
Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry (ADCRR) 
21. Allows ADCRR, at the Director's discretion, to use monies in the Transition Program Fund 
and the Alcohol Abuse and Treatment Fund for any ADCRR expenses in FY 2025. 
Miscellaneous 
22. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
June 12, 2024 
ZD/slp