Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1739 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 07/10/2024

                      	HB 2901 
Initials JL/NM 	Page 1 	Substituted 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
House: APPROP DP 9-7-1-0  
 
SB 1739: criminal justice; 2024-2025  
Sponsor: Representative Livingston (with permission of committee on 
Rules), LD 28 
Substituted with HB 2901 
Overview 
Contains provisions relating to criminal justice needed to implement the FY 2025 budget. 
History 
The Arizona Legislature adopts a budget for each fiscal year (FY) that contains general 
appropriations. Article IV, Section 20, Part 2 of the Constitution of Arizona requires the 
General Appropriations Act (feed bill) to contain only appropriations for the different state 
departments, state institutions, public schools and interest on public debt. Statutory changes 
necessary to reconcile the appropriations made in the feed bill and other changes are drafted 
into separate budget bills. These bills are prepared according to subject area. 
Provisions 
Department of Public Safety (DPS)  
1. Mandates that DPS prioritize the concealed weapons permit (CCW) applications of in-
state residents when issuing CCWs. (Sec. 5) 
2. Directs DPS to submit an annual report with specified information on CCWs to the Joint 
Legislative Budget Committee. (Sec. 5)  
3. Permits DPS to use monies in the Fingerprint Clearance Card Fund to pay for DPS 
expenses related to real property use. (Sec. 6)  
4. Delays full implementation of DPS's Major Incidents Division to FY 2028. (Sec. 7)  
5. Amends existing session law to extend the existence of the Fentanyl Prosecution, 
Diversion and Testing Fund through the end of FY 2025, instead of FY 2024. (Sec. 8)  
6. Repeals the Fentanyl Prosecution, Diversion and Testing Fund on July 1, 2025 and 
directs unexpended or unencumbered monies to be deposited into the state General Fund 
(GF). (Sec. 8) 
Department of Homeland Security (AZDOHS) 
7. Amends existing session law to extend the existence of the Antihuman Trafficking Grant 
Fund through the end of FY 2025, instead of FY 2024. (Sec. 9)  
8. Repeals the Antihuman Trafficking Grant Fund on July 1, 2025 and directs unexpended 
or unencumbered monies to be deposited into the state GF. (Sec. 9) 
9. Amends existing session law relating to the Arizona State Nonprofit Security Grant 
Program (Program) as follows: 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	HB 2901 
Initials JL/NM 	Page 2 	Substituted 
a) Limits eligibility for funding from the Program to entities that are able to demonstrate 
both:  
i) a risk or threat that is occurring at the time of the application, or that has occurred 
in the previous two years; and  
ii) that they have not received federal funding in the last three federal grant cycles; 
b) Requires AZDOHS to create an informal review panel, consisting of members with 
specified qualifications, to review Program grant applications for eligibility with the 
above requirements; 
c) Exempts monies in the Program from lapsing;  
d) Directs unexpended or unencumbered monies to be deposited into the state GF on 
October 1, 2028; 
e) Makes these changes retroactive to July 1, 2024. (Sec. 10, 13) 
Judiciary 
10. Changes the name of the Court Appointed Special Advocate Fund to the Court Appointed 
Special Advocate and Vulnerable Persons Fund, and allows said Fund's monies to also be 
used for court functions benefitting vulnerable persons. (Sec. 2) 
Department of Corrections (DOC) 
11. Permits DOC, at the Director's discretion, to use monies appropriated to DOC from the 
Transition Program Fund in FY 2025 for any DOC expenses. (Sec. 11)  
12. Permits DOC, at the Director's discretion, to use monies appropriated to DOC from the 
Alcohol Abuse Treatment Fund in FY 2025 for any DOC expenses. (Sec. 12)  
Attorney General 
13. Delays the prohibition, on the use of Anti-Racketeering Revolving Fund monies to pay for 
salaries for FTE positions, for one year — from after August 27, 2024 to after August 27, 
2025. (Sec. 4)  
Miscellaneous 
14. Makes technical and conforming changes. (Sec. 1, 3, 7, 10)