Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1743 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/13/2024

                    Assigned to APPROP 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1743 
 
human services; 2024-2025. 
Purpose 
Makes session law changes relating to human services necessary to implement the FY 2025 
state budget.  
Background 
The Arizona Constitution prohibits substantive law from being included in the general 
appropriations, capital outlay appropriations and supplemental appropriations bills. However, it is 
often necessary to make statutory and session law changes to effectuate the budget. Thus, separate 
bills called budget reconciliation bills (BRBs) are introduced to enact these provisions. Because 
BRBs contain substantive law changes, the Arizona Constitution provides that they become 
effective on the general effective date, unless an emergency clause is enacted.  
S.B. 1743 contains the budget reconciliation provisions for changes relating to human 
services. 
Provisions 
Extended Foster Care Comprehensive Service Model 
1. Allows monies in the Extended Foster Care Comprehensive Service Model Fund (Model Fund) 
to be used beyond FY 2024 until June 30, 2025. 
2. Repeals the Model Fund and related requirements on July 1, 2025, and directs any remaining 
unexpended and unencumbered monies in the Model Fund to be transferred to the state General 
Fund (state GF). 
Homeless Shelter and Services Fund 
3. Accelerates the repeal of the Homeless Shelter and Services Fund from October 1, 2027, to 
July 1, 2025, and directs any remaining unexpended and unencumbered monies in the 
Homeless Shelter and Services Fund to be transferred to the state GF.  
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) 
4. Continues to require the Department of Economic Security (DES) in FY 2025 to screen and 
test each adult recipient who: 
a) is eligible for TANF cash benefits; and 
b) DES has reasonable cause to believe engages in the illegal use of controlled substances.  FACT SHEET 
S.B. 1743 
Page 2 
 
 
5. Continues to render any TANF recipient who tests positive for the use of a controlled substance 
that was not prescribed for the recipient by a licensed health care provider as ineligible to 
receive TANF benefits for a period of one year. 
Miscellaneous 
6. Becomes effective on the general effective date.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
June 12, 2024 
MM/KS/slp