Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2312 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/11/2025

                      	HB 2312 
Initials AG/AB 	Page 1 	Health & Human Services 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-seventh Legislature 
First Regular Session 
 
 
HB 2312: dental board; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Bliss, LD 1 
Committee on Health & Human Services 
Overview 
Continues the State Board of Dental Examiners (Board) for 6 years.  
History 
The Board was established in 1935 to regulate and license dental professionals, including 
dentists, dental hygienists, dental consultants, dental therapists, denturists and dental 
assistants. Its mission is to provide professional, courteous service and information to the 
dental profession and public through examination, licensure, complaint adjudication and 
enforcement processes to protect the oral health, safety and welfare of Arizona citizens 
through a fair and impartial system. The Board reviews complaints, investigates allegations 
and takes disciplinary action for violations of law (A.R.S. § 32-1207). 
The Board consists of 11 members appointed by the Governor to serve four-year terms: 1) six 
licensed dentists; 2) two licensed dental hygienists; 3) two public members; and 4) one 
business entity member (A.R.S. § 32-1203). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference (COR) met jointly on January 17, 2025, to conduct a review of the Board. The 
COR recommended the Board be continued for six years.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactively to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2031. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note