Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2312 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2025

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Seventh Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2312 
 
dental board; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Board of Dental Examiners (BODEX) for six years. 
Background 
BODEX is the regulatory body that oversees the licensing and practice of dental care in 
Arizona. BODEX's duties include: 1) adopting and enforcing rules to regulate the practice of 
dentists, supervised personnel and registered business entities; 2) maintaining a record of 
BODEX's acts and proceedings, including issuance, denial, renewal and suspension of licenses 
and complaints; 3) establishing a standard of educational requirements, as prescribed;  
4) determining the reputability of dental, dental therapy and dental hygiene schools; 5) issuing 
licenses and restricted permits to eligible persons; 6) investigating misconduct charges of licensees 
and those with restricted permits; 7) issuing disciplinary action against licensees, certificate 
holders and restricted permittees; 8) establishing criteria for the renewal of permits relating to 
general anesthesia and sedation; and 9) any other duties necessary to enforce the regulation of the 
dental profession (A.R.S. § 32-1207).  
BODEX consists of 11 members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) 6 licensed 
dentists; 2) 2 dental hygienists; 3) 2 public members; and 4) 1 business entity. Members are limited 
to two consecutive four-year terms. Before appointment, a prospective member of BODEX must 
submit a full set of fingerprints to the Governor to obtain a state and federal criminal records check 
(A.R.S. § 32-1203).  
The Senate and House of Representatives Health and Human Services Joint Committee of 
Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 17, 2025, to review the Auditor General's 
performance audit and sunset review 24-month follow up, consider BODEX's responses to the 
statutorily outlined sunset review factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended 
that BODEX be continued for six years until July 1, 2031 (COR Minutes). BODEX is set to 
terminate on July 1, 2025, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3025.09). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2025, BODEX until July 1, 2031. 
2. Repeals BODEX on January 1, 2032. 
3. Contains a purpose statement.  FACT SHEET 
H.B. 2312 
Page 2 
 
 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
House Action 
HHS 2/13/25 DP 12-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/26/25  50-8-2 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 22, 2025 
MM/AO/slp