Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2313 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/11/2025

                      	HB 2313 
Initials AG/AB 	Page 1 	Health & Human Services 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-seventh Legislature 
First Regular Session 
 
 
HB 2313: behavioral health examiners board; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Bliss, LD 1 
Committee on Health & Human Services 
Overview 
Continues the State Board of Behavioral Health Examiners (Board) for 6 years. 
History 
Established in 1989, the Board was created to establish and maintain standards of 
qualifications and performance for licensed behavioral health professionals in the areas of 
counseling, marriage and family therapy, social work and addiction counseling and to 
regulate the practice of licensed behavioral health professionals for the protection of the 
public. Responsibilities of the Board include: 1) issuing and renewing licenses for qualified 
individuals; 2) establishing and collecting fees; and 3) keeping records of all licensed persons, 
applications, dispersed monies and the actions taken on licenses including the renewal, 
suspension, denial or revocation or probation of a licensee (A.R.S. § 32-3253). 
The Board is comprised of eight professional members and four public members who are each 
appointed by the Governor (A.R.S. § 32-3252).  
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference (COR) met jointly on January 17, 2025 to conduct a review of the Board. The 
COR recommended the Board be continued for six years.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2031. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 4) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note