Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2313 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2025

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Seventh Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2313 
 
behavioral health examiners board; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Board of Behavioral Health Examiners (Board) for six years. 
Background 
The Board was established to maintain standards of qualification and performance for 
licensees and to regulate the practice of licensed behavioral health professionals to protect the 
public. Board duties include: 1) adopting rules to enforce requirements related to the licensure of 
behavioral health professionals; 2) licensure of behavioral professionals; 3) maintaining records 
of all licensed behavioral health professionals, all actions taken on applications for licensure, and 
actions involving the renewal, suspension, revocation or denial of a license; 4) conducting 
investigations to determine whether a licensee or applicant has engaged in unprofessional conduct, 
is mentally or physically unable to engage in the practice of behavioral health; 5) conducting 
disciplinary actions; and 6) establishing a licensure fee schedule annually, by a formal vote at a 
Board meeting (A.R.S. § 32-3253). 
The Board consists of 12 members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) 2 members 
who are licensed in social work, one of whom is a licensed clinical social worker; 2) 2 members 
who are licensed in counseling, one of whom is a licensed professional counselor; 3) 2 members 
who are licensed in marriage and family therapy, 1 of whom is a licensed marriage and family 
therapist; 4) 2 members who are licensed in addiction counseling, 1 of whom is a licensed 
independent addiction counselor; and 5) 4 public members. Board members serve three-year terms 
and may not serve more than two successive terms. Each Board member must complete a  
twelve-hour training program that emphasizes responsibilities for administrative management, 
licensure, judicial processes and temperament within one year after appointment to the Board 
(A.R.S. § 32-3252).  
The Senate and House of Representatives Health and Human Services Joint Committee of 
Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 17, 2025, to review and evaluate the Auditor 
General's performance audit and sunset review, consider the Board's responses to the statutorily 
outlined sunset factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the Board be 
continued for six years until July 1, 2031 (COR Minutes). The Board is set to terminate on July 1, 
2025, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3025.14). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2031.  FACT SHEET 
H.B. 2313 
Page 2 
 
 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
House Action 
HHS 2/13/25 DP 12-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/26/25  45-13-2 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 24, 2025 
MM/AO/slp