Assigned to HHS FOR COMMITTEE ARIZONA STATE SENATE Fifty-Seventh Legislature, First Regular Session FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2313 behavioral health examiners board; continuation Purpose Continues the Arizona Board of Behavioral Health Examiners (Board) for six years. Background The Board was established to maintain standards of qualification and performance for licensees and to regulate the practice of licensed behavioral health professionals to protect the public. Board duties include: 1) adopting rules to enforce requirements related to the licensure of behavioral health professionals; 2) licensure of behavioral professionals; 3) maintaining records of all licensed behavioral health professionals, all actions taken on applications for licensure, and actions involving the renewal, suspension, revocation or denial of a license; 4) conducting investigations to determine whether a licensee or applicant has engaged in unprofessional conduct, is mentally or physically unable to engage in the practice of behavioral health; 5) conducting disciplinary actions; and 6) establishing a licensure fee schedule annually, by a formal vote at a Board meeting (A.R.S. § 32-3253). The Board consists of 12 members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) 2 members who are licensed in social work, one of whom is a licensed clinical social worker; 2) 2 members who are licensed in counseling, one of whom is a licensed professional counselor; 3) 2 members who are licensed in marriage and family therapy, 1 of whom is a licensed marriage and family therapist; 4) 2 members who are licensed in addiction counseling, 1 of whom is a licensed independent addiction counselor; and 5) 4 public members. Board members serve three-year terms and may not serve more than two successive terms. Each Board member must complete a twelve-hour training program that emphasizes responsibilities for administrative management, licensure, judicial processes and temperament within one year after appointment to the Board (A.R.S. § 32-3252). The Senate and House of Representatives Health and Human Services Joint Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 17, 2025, to review and evaluate the Auditor General's performance audit and sunset review, consider the Board's responses to the statutorily outlined sunset factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the Board be continued for six years until July 1, 2031 (COR Minutes). The Board is set to terminate on July 1, 2025, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3025.14). There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. Provisions 1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2031. FACT SHEET H.B. 2313 Page 2 2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. 3. Contains a purpose statement. 4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. House Action HHS 2/13/25 DP 12-0-0-0 3 rd Read 2/26/25 45-13-2 Prepared by Senate Research March 24, 2025 MM/AO/slp